This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2021 at 07:17:00 (UTC).

Williams et al v. Ethicon Women's Health and Urology et al

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon Women's Health and Urology. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-04285

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Haywood S Gilliam, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIEL WILLIAMS

DAWN WILLIAMS

Defendants

ETHICON WOMENS HEALTH AND UROLOGY, a Division of ETHICON, INC

GYNECARE, a Division of ETHICON, INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

ETHICON, INC

Ethicon Women's Health and Urology

Gynecare

Ethicon, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher B. Dolan

Attorney at The Dolan Law Firm

1438 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Lourdes DeArmas

Attorney at The Dolan Law Firm

1438 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Lourdes DeArmas-Smith

Attorney at The Dolan Law Firm

1438 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

#4

#5

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for September 7, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by August 31, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-04285-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 6/25/21. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2021) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • Docket(#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (rmm2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dawn Williams.. (DeArmas-Smith, Lourdes) (Filed on 6/24/2021) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Dawn Williams.. (DeArmas-Smith, Lourdes) (Filed on 6/23/2021) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/26/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/2/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Incorrect event used for Proposed Summons. [err101]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file Summons attachment using correct Proposed Summons event. Re: #1 Complaint, Attachment- 1 Summons filed by Dawn Williams (arkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/10/2021) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/23/2021. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe nature of suit on civil cover sheet and docket do not match, please advise which nature of suit is correct. #Electronic filing error. This filing will not be processed by the c lerks office. Re: #1 Complaint filed by DAWN WILLIAMS (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2021) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-16045267.). Filed byDAWN WILLIAMS. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(DeArmas-Smith, Lourdes) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Women's Health and Urology is a litigant

Latest cases where Gynecare is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant