This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:40:48 (UTC).

Williams et al v. Croom et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Croom. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wesley Williams

Phillip Williams

Defendants

Redmond Croom

Crete Carrier Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert B. Keaty, II

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan (Nashville Office)

810 Broadway, Suite 105

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorneys

Paige I. Bernick

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500

Nashville, TN 37219

Mary Beth White

Attorney at Lewis, Thomason, King, Krieg & Waldrop, P.C. (Nashville)

424 Church Street, Suite 2500

Nashville, TN 37219

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crete Carrier Corporation from Circuit Court of Maury County, case number 17155. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3508526) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Removal Notices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit A-State Court Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B-Removal Notices

1 #3

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/21/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

#6

(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Crete Carrier Corporation. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/10/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION Entry of Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal by Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal)(White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

8 #1

Attachment Proposed Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Redmond Croom.(Bernick, Paige) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16(h)(2), notice is hereby given of Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation's motion #8 for entry of the parties' proposed agreed order for partial dismissal of the direct negligence claims against Defendant Crete Carrier (Docket No. [8-1]). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/14/2022. (kc) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Crete Carrier Corporation.(White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Crete Carrier Corporation.(White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 16(h)(2), notice is hereby given of Defendant Crete Carrier Corporation's motion #8 for entry of the parties' proposed agreed order for partial dismissal of the direct negligence claims against Defendant Crete Carrier (Docket No. [8-1]). Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes on 2/14/2022. (kc) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Redmond Croom.(Bernick, Paige) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION Entry of Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal by Crete Carrier Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Proposed Agreed Order of Partial Dismissal)(White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 1/10/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(kc) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Crete Carrier Corporation. (White, Mary Beth) (Entered: 01/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 3/21/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Beth White, Paige I. Bernick, and Robert B. Keaty, II admitted to this court. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Crete Carrier Corporation from Circuit Court of Maury County, case number 17155. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0650-3508526) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Removal Notices, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(vh) (Entered: 01/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crete Carrier Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mary Beth White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Paige I. Bernick