This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:22:14 (UTC).

Williams et al v. Biesek et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Biesek. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patrick R Wyrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01139

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patrick R Wyrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Keytona Reynolds

Kevin Williams

Madrell Kearney

Defendants

Point Transport LLC

Jered Biesek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

Lauren G Lambright

Attorney at Smolen & Roytman PLLC

701 S Cincinnati Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

Daniel E Smolen

Attorney at Smolen Smolen & Roytman PLLC

701 S Cincinnati Ave

Tulsa, OK 74119

Daniel K Jones

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

Mehry Taremi

Attorney at Mills & Jones PLLC

2760 Washington Dr, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73069

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Point Transport LLC (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Their Response in Opposition to #7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to defendants' motion on or before Wednesday, January 15, 2020 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#14

(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Villatoro Order)(Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

14 #1

Exhibit Ex 1 - Villatoro Order

#13

(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collision Report)(Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Point Transport LLC . (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1_OSCN Dkt Summ

#10

(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Jered Biesek (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#3

(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Point Transport LLC (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Point Transport LLC. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#11

(#11) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Plaintiffs. (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

13 #1

Exhibit Collision Report

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-2019-222 filed by Point Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_OSCN Dkt Summ, #2 Exhibit 2_Petition, #3 Exhibit 3_Summons Def Point, #4 Exhibit 4_Summons Def Biesek, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#9

(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Jered Biesek (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2_Petition

#6

(#6) ENTER ORDER directing attorney Lauren G. Lambright to be admitted to the bar of this court and register for electronic case filing (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/10/2019. (ks) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 - Villatoro Order)(Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Collision Report)(Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to File Their Response in Opposition to #7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Plaintiffs shall file their response in opposition to defendants' motion on or before Wednesday, January 15, 2020 (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/23/2019. (ks) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Plaintiffs. (Smolen, Daniel) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Jered Biesek (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Jered Biesek (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by All Defendants.(Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by All Defendants. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTER ORDER directing attorney Lauren G. Lambright to be admitted to the bar of this court and register for electronic case filing (as more fully set out). Signed by Honorable Patrick R Wyrick on 12/10/2019. (ks) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Point Transport LLC . (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-3050895. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Point Transport LLC. (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Mehry Taremi on behalf of Point Transport LLC (Taremi, Mehry) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Point Transport LLC (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of McClain County, case number CJ-2019-222 filed by Point Transport LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_OSCN Dkt Summ, #2 Exhibit 2_Petition, #3 Exhibit 3_Summons Def Point, #4 Exhibit 4_Summons Def Biesek, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(rb) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.