This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/04/2022 at 07:56:04 (UTC).

Williams, Derek v. Schultz, Michael et al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Williams, Derek filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Schultz, Michael. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James D. Peterson and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00002

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D. Peterson

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Derek M. Williams

Portage, WI 53901-0900

Defendants

Michael J. Schultz

Stacey A. Tilot

Not Classified By Court

CCI Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Derek M. Williams. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#2

(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Derek M. Williams. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 1/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/03/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 297.14 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/13/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketInitial Partial Filing fee received: $ 297.14, receipt number 34690040134. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 02/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 297.14 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 2/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/13/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Plaintiff Derek M. Williams (Attachments: #1 IPP Calculation) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER that Plaintiff submits a Trust Fund Account Statement by 1/24/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 01/03/2022. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Derek M. Williams. (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants., filed by Derek M. Williams. (Case non-randomly assigned to District Judge James D. Peterson.) (aom),(ps) (Entered: 01/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CCI Prison Facility is a litigant