This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 04:41:39 (UTC).

Williams-Bradley v. DW Crossland, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2020 Williams-Bradley filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DW Crossland, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen Gren Scholer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01221

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen Gren Scholer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elisha Williams-Bradley

Defendants

DW Crossland, LLC

Hometowne Studios LLC doing business as HomeTowne Studios by Red Roof and DW Crossland LLC

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mark C Frels

Attorney at Mark Frels, Attorney at Law

1808 S Good Latimer Expwy, Ste 216

Dallas, TX 75226

Defendant Attorneys

Tracy Graves Wolf

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2100 Ross Ave, Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Brent Douglas Sedge

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

2100 Ross Avenue, Suite 2000

Dallas, TX 75201

Courtenay L Bass

Attorney at Gilbert Mediation Group

12001 N Central Expressway, Ste 650

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS the Motion and the case is REMANDED to the 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/4/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Defendants' Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Hometowne Studios LLC (Wolf, Tracy) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2020. Motions due by 7/2/2021. Discovery due by 6/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/28/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/28/2020) (aaa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#6

(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Elisha Williams-Bradley. (Frels, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit(s)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Remand filed by Elisha Williams-Bradley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Frels, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling hearing via teleconference on 5/28/2020 04:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/14/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER: Accordingly, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/13/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#2

(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

1 #13

Exhibit(s) Declaration

1 #12

Exhibit(s) Answer

1 #11

Exhibit(s) Return of Service

1 #10

Exhibit(s) Return of Service

1 #7

Exhibit(s) Request for Service

1 #3

Exhibit(s) Petition

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Docket

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Index

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Notice of Mailing a certified copy of re #12 Order on Motion to Remand, the docket sheet and the Remand Letter to the 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, TX. (ykp) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS the Motion and the case is REMANDED to the 44th Judicial District Court, Dallas County, Texas. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 6/4/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Defendants' Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand filed by Hometowne Studios LLC (Wolf, Tracy) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • Docket(#10) ELECTRONIC ORDER: At the FRCP 16 Scheduling Conference, held on May 28, 2020, Plaintiff orally moved for leave to amend her Complaint, and the Court granted the Motion. Accordingly, Plaintiff must file an amended Complaint by June 18, 2020. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/29/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2020. Motions due by 7/2/2021. Discovery due by 6/15/2021. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/28/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION: The court appoints Courtenay L Bass as mediator. The parties are to complete mediation within 90 days. #Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. The clerk will send any requested documents to the mediator. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/28/2020) (aaa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Karen Gren Scholer: Scheduling Teleconference held on 5/28/2020. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Mark Frels; Defense - Tracy Wolf. (Court Reporter: Tutti Bui) (No exhibits) Time in Court - :11. (TUB) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Elisha Williams-Bradley. (Frels, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand filed by Elisha Williams-Bradley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s)) (Frels, Mark) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 16, the Court hereby sets this case for a scheduling hearing via teleconference on 5/28/2020 04:00 PM before Judge Karen Gren Scholer. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/14/2020) (ykp) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: Accordingly, no later than 21 days from the date of this Order, Defendant must file an amended notice of removal that alleges diversity of citizenship, in conformity with 28 U.S.C. 1332; otherwise, this action will be remanded to state court. (Ordered by Judge Karen Gren Scholer on 5/13/2020) (ctf) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 44th District Court, Dallas County, case number DC-20-05599 filed by DW Crossland, LLC. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10832608) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Index, #2 Exhibit(s) Docket, #3 Exhibit(s) Petition, #4 Exhibit(s) cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit(s) Citation, #6 Exhibit(s) Citation, #7 Exhibit(s) Request for Service, #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s) Status Conference, #10 Exhibit(s) Return of Service, #11 Exhibit(s) Return of Service, #12 Exhibit(s) Answer, #13 Exhibit(s) Declaration) (Wolf, Tracy) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brent Douglas Sedge

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtenay L Bass