This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/18/2020 at 09:05:10 (UTC).

William v. CR Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 William filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CR Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Raag Singhal. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-23442

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Raag Singhal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Beverly William

Defendants

Does 1 through 100 inclusive

McKesson Corporation

C R Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Darren McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Eric Martin Przybysz

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Steven Scott Schulte

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Sharon Jessica Zinns

Attorney at Zinns Law, LLC

2082 Westwood Rd Se, 30080

Smyrna, GA 30080

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Junek

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expwy, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expy Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Jordan E. Jarreau

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Rebecca Ocariz

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG, P.A.

Suite 4400, 333 Se 2Nd Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

Sabrina R. Gallo

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig

333 S. E. 2Nd Avenue

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#38

37 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#37

#35

#34

#33

#32

31 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#31

1 #11

Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued Bard Peripheral Vascular

1 #10

Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand

1 #9

Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info. Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition

1 #5

Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition

1 #4

Exhibit(s) B - McKesson

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted)

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER granting #37 Temporary Stay. This case is STAYED for a period of 90 days. The Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 9/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 09/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) Joint MOTION to Stay AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Responses due by 9/25/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Steven S. Schulte. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/31/2020. (pb00) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Steven Schulte. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13431752 by Beverly William. Responses due by 9/11/2020 (Zinns, Sharon) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sharon Jessica Zinns on behalf of Beverly William. Attorney Sharon Jessica Zinns added to party Beverly William(pty:pla). (Zinns, Sharon) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER Granting Defendants' Unopposed #31 Motion For Substitution Of Counsel. Attorneys Jordan E. Jarreau, Jessica Junek and Melissa Dorman Matthews representing C R Bard Inc (Defendant) and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. (Defendant) and McKesson Corporation (Defendant) terminated. Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Jordan Jarreau, Jessica Junek, Melissa Matthews. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STIPULATION of Dismissal OF CLAIMS AGAINST DEFENDANT MCKESSON CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation (Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Defendant's STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Rebecca A. Ocariz and Sabrina R. Gallo for Jordan E. Jarreau, Jessica Junek and Melissa Dorman Matthews by Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. Attorney Rebecca Ocariz added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft). Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 8/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rebecca Ocariz on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C R Bard Inc. Attorney Rebecca Ocariz added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Ocariz added to party C R Bard Inc(pty:dft). (Ocariz, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced to flatten image on 6/16/2020) (dsr). (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the docket of the Honorable Karen Gren Scholer. All future pleadings shall subsequently be filed under Civil Action No. 3:20-cv-01490-S. (Ordered by Chief Judge Barbara M. G. Lynn on 6/10/2020) (aaa) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C R Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc re #3 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of State Plaintiffs' Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, C R Bard Inc (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by C. R. Bard, Inc., Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10899538) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement (redacted), #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Docs, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info. Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 Jury Demand, #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued Bard Peripheral Vascular, #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued C.R. Bard Inc., #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Citation Issued McKisson, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Executed Aff of Service to McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Executed Return of Service C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Executed Return of Service Bard Peripheral) (Junek, Jessica) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where McKesson Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHARON JESSICA ZINNS