This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/28/2021 at 18:28:42 (UTC).

William Smith et al v. The Weeknd et al

Case Summary

On 04/03/2019 William Smith filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against The Weeknd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Percy Anderson and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02507

  • Filing Date:

    04/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Scott McCulloch

William Smith

Defendants

Wassim Salibi

UMG Recordings, Inc.

Universal Music Publishing LTD

Jason Quenneville

MXM Publishing

Kobalt Songs Music Publishing, Inc.

Savan Harish Kotecha

The Weeknd XO, Inc.

Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.

Artist Nation Management Group, Inc.

The Weeknd

Peter Anders Svensson

Universal Music Group, Inc.

Karl Martin Sandberg

Big Life Music Ltd

Ahmad Balshe

KMR Music Royalties II SCSP

Songs of SMP

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Glen L Kulik

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman Siegel and Ware LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

David Anthony Bernardoni

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman Siegel and Ware LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Alfred J Fluehr

Attorney at Francis Alexander LLC

280 North Providence Road Suite 1

Media, PA 19063

Francis A Malofiy

Attorney at Francis Alexander LLC

280 North Providence Road Suite 1

Media, PA 19063

James B Glennon

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi and Rudloff PC

38 Corporate Park

Irvine, CA 92606

Tracey A Jordan

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi and Rudloff PC

222 North Lasalle Street Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

Thomas B Orlando

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palandech Ponzi and Rudloff PC

222 North Lasalle Street Suite 1400

Chicago, IL 60601

Diana R. Lotfi

Attorney at Foran Glennon Palondech Ponzi and Rudloff PC

38 Corporate Park

Irvine, CA 92606

Defendant Attorneys

Peter J. Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Peter J Anderson

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Nicolette Aster Vairo

Attorney at Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

865 South Figueroa Street Suite 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Other Attorneys

Alan Glenn Dowling

Attorney at Alan G Dowling Law Offices

1043 Pacific Street No 1

Santa Monica, CA 90405

Sidney Kanazawa

Attorney at SK Law Mediation

514 Loring Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90024

 

Court Documents

#152

#151

#148

#139

6 #2

Exhibit 2

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

153 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#152) BILL OF COSTS. Costs taxed in the amount of $10,090.56 in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs. RE: APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against All Plaintiffs re: Judgment. #139 , #143 (vmun) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#151) MINUTE ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) - COURT ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson re: #144 MOTION for Attorney Fees. For the foregoing reasons, the Court concludes that the degree of success that Defendants achieved is the only factor that weighs clearly in favor of awarding them attorneys' fees. All other factors either are on balance neutral or weigh against awarding fees. Taking into account all of the circumstances of the case and considering all of the relevant factors, the Court in its discretion declines to award attorneys' fees to Defendants. See Ets-Hokin, 323 F.3d at 766 (affirming denial of fees where the only factor weighing in the prevailing defendant's favor was the degree of success obtained). The Court therefore denies Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR DETAILS) (mrgo) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#150) REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #144 filed by Defendants MXM Music AB, The Weeknd XO, LLC, Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration, #2 Exhibit 4, #3 Exhibit 5, #4 Exhibit 6)(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#149) Opposition Motion to Appoint Attorneys Fees re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees #144 filed by Plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brian Clover, #2 Declaration Declaration of Scott McCulloch)(Glennon, James) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#148) NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-55861 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals,, #146 as to Plaintiffs Brian Clover and Scott McCulloch. (yl) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#147) RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs All Plaintiffs re: Judgment, #139 , #143 filed by Defendants Artist Nation Management Group, Inc., Ahmad Balshe, DeHeala and Co., LLC, Kobalt Songs Music Publishing, Inc., Savan Harish Kotecha, MXM Music AB, MXM Publishing, MXM, LLC, Jason Quenneville, SONGS Music Publishing LLC, Sal and CO LP, Sal and CO Management LP, Wassim Salibi, Karl Martin Sandberg, Songs of SMP, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye, The Weeknd XO Music, ULC, The Weeknd XO, Inc., The Weeknd XO, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Group, Inc., Universal Music Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp., Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Wolf Cousins, XO&co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3)(Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#146) NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff/Appellant Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch. Appeal of Judgment, #139 , Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,,, #138 , Order on Motion to Continue,,, #123 , Order on Motion to Compel Answers to Interrogatories,, Order on Motion to Produce, #108 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Add and Terminate Attorneys,, #107 , Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,,, #105 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,, #56 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27699332.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Judgement and Orders)(Glennon, James) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#145) OBJECTIONS to APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs All Plaintiffs re: Judgment, #139 , #143 filed by Plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Glennon, James) (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#144) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by defendants MXM Music AB, The Weeknd XO, LLC, Warner/Chappell Music, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/14/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of P. Anderson, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Declaration of L. Pina, #7 Proposed Order) (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#143) APPLICATION to the Clerk to Tax Costs against plaintiffs All Plaintiffs re: Judgment, #139 , filed by defendants Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., MXM Music AB, Jason Quenneville, The Weeknd XO, Inc., DeHeala and Co., LLC, The Weeknd XO, LLC, XO&co., Inc., Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Publishing, Inc., SONGS Music Publishing LLC, Savan Harish Kotecha, Wolf Cousins, UMG Recordings, Inc., Karl Martin Sandberg, Kobalt Songs Music Publishing, Inc., Sal and CO Management LP, Ahmad Balshe, Artist Nation Management Group, Inc., Wassim Salibi, Sal and CO LP, The Weeknd XO Music, ULC, MXM, LLC, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Anderson, Peter) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
132 More Docket Entries
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Artist Nation Management Group, Inc., Ahmad Balshe, Big Life Music Ltd, DeHeala and Co., LLC, KMR Music Royalties II SCSP, Kobalt Songs Music Publishing, Inc., Savan Harish Kotecha, MXM Music AB, MXM Publishing, MXM, LLC, Ali Payami, Jason Quenneville, SONGS Music Publishing LLC, Sal and CO LP, Sal and CO Management LP, Wassim Salibi, Karl Martin Sandberg, Songs of SMP, Peter Anders Svensson, Abel Makkonen Tesfaye, The Weeknd, The Weeknd XO Music, ULC, The Weeknd XO, Inc., The Weeknd XO, LLC, UMG Recordings, Inc., Universal Music Corporation, Universal Music Group, Inc., Universal Music Publishing BL Limited, Universal Music Publishing LTD, Universal Music Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp., Warner/Chappell Music Scandinavia AB, Warner/Chappell Music, Inc., Wolf Cousins, XO&co., Inc. (esa) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (esa) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alfred J. Fluehr to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23490646) filed by plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Francis Malofiy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23490431) filed by plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order) (Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith, (Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Brian Clover, Scott McCulloch, William Smith. (Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23489776 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Brian Clover, William Smith, Scott McCulloch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Attorney David Anthony Bernardoni added to party Brian Clover(pty:pla), Attorney David Anthony Bernardoni added to party Scott McCulloch(pty:pla), Attorney David Anthony Bernardoni added to party William Smith(pty:pla))(Bernardoni, David) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Warner/Chappell Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where UMG Recordings, Inc. is a litigant