This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/31/2020 at 21:37:07 (UTC).

William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC v. Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/24/2019 William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald S.W. Lew, Alexander F. MacKinnon and Andre Birotte Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05465

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alexander F. MacKinnon

Presiding Judges

Ronald S.W. Lew

Andre Birotte Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC

Consolidated Plaintiffs and Consolidated Counter Defendants

United Talent Agency LLC

Creative Artists Agency LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Writers Guild of America, East, Inc.

Writers Guild of America, West, Inc.

Meredith Stiehm

Ashley Gable

Deirdre Mangan

David Simon

Barbara Hall

Deric A. Hughes

Patricia Carr

Interested Party

United States of America

8 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Diana Hughes Leiden

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue 38Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

Jeffrey L Kessler

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Shawn R Obi

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

333 South Grand Avenue Suite 3800

Los Angeles, CA 90071-1543

David L Greenspan

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Isabelle Mercier-Dalphond

Attorney at Winston and Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166-4193

Consolidated Plaintiff and Consolidated Counter Defendant Attorneys

Stephen M Payne

Attorney at Irell and Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Jeremy M Mittman

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3120

Jean P Nogues

Attorney at Mitchell Silberberg and Knupp LLP

2049 Century Park East 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Steven A Marenberg

Attorney at Irell and Manella LLP

1800 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-4276

Nicholas Frederic Daum

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Richard B Kendall

Attorney at Kendall Brill and Kelly LLP

10100 Santa Monica Boulevard Suite 1725

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Stacey M Leyton

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

W Stephen Cannon

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw Suite 1300 N

Washington, DC 20004

Stephen P Berzon

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

P Casey Pitts

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Rebecca C Lee

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Ethan E Litwin

Attorney at Constantine Cannon LLP

335 Madison Avenue 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Anthony R Segall

Attorney at Rothner Segall and Greenstone

510 South Marengo Avenue

Pasadena, CA 91101-3115

Andrew Edward Kushner

Attorney at Altshuler Berzon LLP

177 Post Street Suite 300

San Francisco, CA 94108

Interested Party Attorney

Nickolai Gilford Levin

Attorney at US Department of Justice

950 Pennsylvania Avenue Nw Office 3224

Washington, DC 20530

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#82

81 #1

Proposed Order

#81

#80

#79

#78

#77

54 #1

Proposed Order

#54

#2

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

158 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants and Counterclaimants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Andrew Kushner at akushner@altber.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kushner, Andrew) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) Joint STIPULATION for Order to Extend Time to Select Mediator filed by Plaintiff and Counter-Defendant United Talent Agency LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marenberg, Steven) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#80) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Diana Hughes Leiden at DHLeiden@winston.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Diana Hughes Leiden at DHLeiden@winston.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Plaintiffs and Counterclaim Defendants William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, Creative Artists Agency, LLC, and United Talent Agency, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaimants' Consolidated Counterclaims #54 . The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motion under submission. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (gk) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants and Counterclaimants Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., Writers Guild of America, West, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Andrew Kushner at akushner@altber.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Kushner, Andrew) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) SUPPLEMENT to Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan #68 filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING PLAINTIFFS AND COUNTERCLAIM DEFENDANTS WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT, LLC'S, CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY, LLC'S, AND UNITED TALENT AGENCY, LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTERCLAIMANTS' CONSOLIDATED COUNTERCLAIMS #54 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. This Court, on its own motion, hereby continues the hearing date regarding this motion from January 17, 2020 to Friday, January 24, 2020, at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. IT IS SO ORDERED.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ORDER RE: JURY/COURT TRIAL: I. SCHEDULE; II. TRIAL PREPARATION; III. CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Jury Trial set for 3/23/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions In Limine set for 3/5/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Last Date to Hear Motion to Amend Pleadings/Add Parties 10/23/2020. Non-Expert Discovery cut-off 10/1/2020. Last Date to Hear Motions 12/11/2020. Deadline to Complete Settlement Conference 12/25/2020. Trial Filings (first round): Motions In Limine, Memoranda of Contentions of Fact and Law, Witness Lists, Joint Exhibit List, Joint Status Report Regarding Settlement due by 3/2/2021. Trial Filings (second round): Oppositions to Motions In Limine, Joint Proposed Final Pretrial Conference Order due by 3/9/2021. See document for further details. (gk) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) AMENDED ORDER #70 DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS #43 , #47 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. See document for details. (gk) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (car) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Isabelle Mercier-Dalphond to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23968362) filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney David L. Greenspan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23968350) filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Jeffrey L. Kessler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-23968285) filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC identifying WME IMG, LLC d/b/a Endeavor as Corporate Parent. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, identifying William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC, Writers Guild of America, West, Inc., Writers Guild of America, East, Inc., WME IMG, LLC d/b/a Endeavor. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23968035 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (Attorney Diana Hughes Leiden added to party William Morris Endeavor Entertainment, LLC(pty:pla))(Leiden, Diana) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRITERS GUILD OF AMERICA WEST INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITED TALENT AGENCY LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WILLIAM MORRIS ENDEAVOR ENTERTAINMENT LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where CREATIVE ARTISTS AGENCY is a litigant