This case was last updated from PACER on 12/12/2020 at 09:26:03 (UTC).

Willard v. State of Mississippi

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 Willard filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against State of Mississippi. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra M. Brown and David A. Sanders. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00182

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Mississippi Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Debra M. Brown

Referral Judge

David A. Sanders

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wade Alan Willard, Jr.

Carthage, MS 39051

Defendant

State of Mississippi

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb)

#9

(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. (cb)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#7

(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Spears Hearing set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/20/2020. (cb)

#5

(#5) ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/20/2020. (cb)

#4

(#4) ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 11/19/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (cb)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/20/2020) (cb).

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #6 ORDER Spears Hearing set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT, and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline. (cb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. (cb) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Spears Hearing set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in Amory Courtroom 1 Video Conference before Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/20/2020. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING #2 Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Without Assessing Payment of Initial Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 10/20/2020. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 11/19/2020.. Signed by Clerk on 10/20/2020. (cb)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (cb) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/20/2020) (cb).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, filed by Wade Alan Willard, Jr. (cb) (Entered: 10/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less