This case was last updated from PACER on 08/04/2019 at 07:59:30 (UTC).

Wilkinson v. Berryhill

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 Wilkinson filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Berryhill. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dudley H. Bowen and Brian K. Epps. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dudley H. Bowen

Referral Judge

Brian K. Epps

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Douglas Wilkinson

Defendant

Nancy A. Berryhill

Not Classified By Court

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward B. Claxton, III

Attorney at Edward B. Claxton, III, LLC

P.O. Box 16459

Dublin, GA 31040

Karl E Osterhout

Attorney at Osterhout Berger Disability Law, LLC

512 Cedar Way, Suite 200

Oakmont, PA 15139

Defendant Attorney

Shannon Heath Statkus

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - AUG

P O Box 2017

Augusta, GA 30901

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Corrected Main Document

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hav vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 08/01/2019. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh). (Entered: 08/01/2019)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/06/2019. (jlh) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hav vice for Attorney Karl E. Osterhout. Signed by Judge Dudley H. Bowen on 08/01/2019. (jlh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2019: #1 Corrected Main Document) (jlh). (Entered: 08/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Nancy A. Berryhill (Statkus, Shannon) (Entered: 07/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2626771, Fee Amount $200, by James Douglas Wilkinson. Responses due by 7/4/2019. (Claxton, Edward) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Nancy A. Berryhill, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (jlh) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis subject to objection. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 06/06/2019. (jlh) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by James Douglas Wilkinson. (thb) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Douglas Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Application, #2 Text of Proposed Order)REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps.(thb) Modified on 6/6/2019 (jlh). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Nancy A. Berryhill, filed by James Douglas Wilkinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(thb) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.