This case was last updated from PACER on 09/10/2019 at 07:42:09 (UTC).

Wilkins v. Life Insurance Company of North America

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Wilkins filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Life Insurance Company of North America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-03249

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sheryl Ann Wilkins

Defendant

Life Insurance Company of North America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Rick S. Vasquez

1736 E Sunshine, Ste. 103

Springfield, MO 65804

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE of filing of exhibit A to be attached to Complaint by Sheryl Ann Wilkins re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A denial for Long Term Disability benefits)(Vasquez, Rick) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS..Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

2 #1

MAP General Order

#4

(#4) STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Rick S. Vasquez on behalf of Sheryl Ann Wilkins. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6397650. Service due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vasquez, Rick) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A denial for Long Term Disability benefits

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • (#5) The Court hereby acknowledges the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (Doc. #4). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed on 8/27/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION of dismissal Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Hanna, William) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Life Insurance Company of North America (emailed to plaintiff's counsel for service). (Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 07/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of filing of exhibit A to be attached to Complaint by Sheryl Ann Wilkins re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A denial for Long Term Disability benefits)(Vasquez, Rick) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS..Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Attachments: #1 MAP General Order)(Siegert, Karen) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America filed by Rick S. Vasquez on behalf of Sheryl Ann Wilkins. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-6397650. Service due by 10/10/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vasquez, Rick) (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.