This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2019 at 09:27:57 (UTC).

Wilkerson v. Mason et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 Wilkerson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Mason. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steve C. Jones and Walter E. Johnson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01317

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gina Wilkerson

Defendants

Lee Mason

Community Association Management, LLC

The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc.

Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Klein

Attorney at Berry & Associates, P.C.

Suite 600, 2751 Buford Highway

Atlanta, GA 30324

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn S. Whitlock

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP-GA

Suite 4000, 303 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30308-3243

Stephen William Rothring

Attorney at Hawkins Parnell & Young, LLP

303 Peachtree Street, Ne, Suite 4000

Atlanta, GA 30308

John Michael Duffoo

Attorney at Business Law Firm of John M. Duffoo, P.C.

P.O. Box 767355

Roswell, GA 30076

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re: #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gina Wilkerson. (Klein, Adam) Modified on 7/15/2019 (rjs). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

#19

(#19) Certificate of Interested Persons by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc.. (Duffoo, John) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc..(Duffoo, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc..(Duffoo, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#16

(#16) MOTION to Stay Discovery, Pretrial Deadlines, and Local Rule Deadlines by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason. (Whitlock, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

15 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

15 #1

Brief Brief to Motion to Dismiss

#15

(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitlock, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#11

(#13) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason.(Whitlock, Kathryn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#8

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to answer.. Defendants answer due 6/28/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/20/19. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Duffoo on behalf of The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc. (Duffoo, John) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. Community Association Management, LLC waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. Lee Mason waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Gina Wilkerson. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#17) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc..(Duffoo, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORAL ORDER granting #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time for Plaintiff to respond to #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Plaintiff's response due 7/26/19. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/15/19. (klb) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time re: #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Gina Wilkerson. (Klein, Adam) Modified on 7/15/2019 (rjs). (Entered: 07/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORAL ORDER granting #16 Motion to Stay Discovery, Pretrial Deadlines, and Local Rule Deadlines by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason. Deadlines stayed until after the Court rules on the Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Entered by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 7/1/19. (klb) (Entered: 07/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Certificate of Interested Persons by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc.. (Duffoo, John) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc..(Duffoo, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc..(Duffoo, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION to Stay Discovery, Pretrial Deadlines, and Local Rule Deadlines by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason. (Whitlock, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with Brief In Support by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason. (Attachments: #1 Brief Brief to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Whitlock, Kathryn) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason (Whitlock, Kathryn) Modified on 7/1/2019 (rjs). (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason.(Whitlock, Kathryn) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to answer.. Defendants answer due 6/28/19. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 5/20/19. (klb) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER Extending Time to File Answer re: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Whitlock, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Community Association Management, LLC, Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC, Lee Mason. (Whitlock, Kathryn) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Duffoo on behalf of The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc. (Duffoo, John) (Entered: 05/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. Community Association Management, LLC waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. Law Offices of Lee Mason, LLC waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. Lee Mason waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Wilkerson. The Club at Ivey Estates, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/25/2019, answer due 5/24/2019. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Gina Wilkerson. (Klein, Adam) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Gina Wilkerson. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8532830) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(tmf) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION MANAGEMENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Klein