This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2020 at 12:41:54 (UTC).

Wilkening v. US Department of Education et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2020 Wilkening filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against US Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Paul A. Magnuson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-01574

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Magnuson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Wilkening

St. Paul, MN 55106-5528

Defendants

US Department of Education

Justice Department Debt Collection Services

US Department of Education - National Payment Ctr/Fed Loan Servicing

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000015 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Christopher Wilkening. (JGK) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER 1.Plaintiff Christopher Wilkenings application to proceed in forma pauperis [Dkt. No. 2] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.2.Wilkening must submit an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis or, alternatively, pay the full filing fee of $400 within 20 days of the date of this order, failing which this action will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/4/2020. (TMA) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher Wilkening. (JGK) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

1 #4

Envelope

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Cover Letter

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Justice Department Debt Collection Services, US Department of Education, US Department of Education - National Payment Ctr/Fed Loan Servicing filed by Christopher Wilkening. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RECEIPT number AMNDC-0000015 in the amount of $400.00 issued to Christopher Wilkening. (JGK) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER 1.Plaintiff Christopher Wilkenings application to proceed in forma pauperis [Dkt. No. 2] is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.2.Wilkening must submit an amended application to proceed in forma pauperis or, alternatively, pay the full filing fee of $400 within 20 days of the date of this order, failing which this action will be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 8/4/2020. (TMA) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs filed by Christopher Wilkening. (JGK) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Justice Department Debt Collection Services, US Department of Education, US Department of Education - National Payment Ctr/Fed Loan Servicing filed by Christopher Wilkening. No summons requested. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Cover Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Envelope) (JGK) Document QC'd on 7/17/2020 (CLK). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less