This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 08:20:02 (UTC).

Wilichowski et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Wilichowski filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy L. Brooks. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-05024

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy L. Brooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kimberly Wilichowski

Kent Wilichowski

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey Kuntz

Attorney at Wagstaff Cartmell LLP

4740 Grand Avenue, Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Sean T. Keith

Attorney at Keith Law Group

5050 W. Northgate Road, Ste 108

Rogers, AR 72758

David C. DeGreeff

Attorney at Wagstaff & Cartmell

4740 Grand Ave., Suite 300

Kansas City, MO 64112

Defendant Attorneys

Eric M. Anielak

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP

2555 Grand Blvd.

Kansas City, MO 64108-2613

Jon A. Strongman

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

Michael A Tanenbaum

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

Three Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street, Suite 1301

Newark, NJ 07102

James H. Keale

Attorney at TANENBAUM KEALE

Three Gateway Center, Suite 1301, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07102

Michael Bonasso

Attorney at FLAHERTY SENSABAUGH & BONASSO

P. O. Box 3843

Charleston, WV 25338-3843

Theodore O'Reilly

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

1800 Century Park East, Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Andrew Gay Jackson

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 Sourth Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lyn Peeples Pruitt

Attorney at DLA Piper US LLP

1900 N Pearl Street, Ste 2200

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

54 #10

Exhibit ECF 4976 - BSC_s Opp to Pltf_s MTE Badylak

54 #9

Exhibit ECF 8364 - BSC_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Response of Badylak

54 #8

Exhibit ECF 4826 - Pltf_s Motion and Memo Support of MTE Badylak

54 #7

Exhibit ECF 8315 - Pltf_s Notice of Adoption of Prior Daubert Motion Badylak

54 #6

Exhibit ECF 8025 - BSC PTO-208 - DCO BSC Wave 7 Cases

54 #5

Exhibit ECF 200 - BSC_s Master Answer to Master Long Form Complaint

54 #4

Exhibit ECF 197 - Master Long Form Complaint

54 #2

Exhibit ECF 184 - BSC PTO-13 - Stipulation for Production of Docs and ESI

54 #1

Exhibit ECF 161 - BSC PTO-11 - Stipulated Protective Order

#8

#7

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

189 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #41 Motion Motion to Exclude Case-Specific Testimony; granting in part and denying in part #54 -56, #54 -41 Motions to Exclude Mays and Rosenblatt; denying in part and moot in part #54 -67 #54 -40 Motions to Exclude Rosenzweig and ; denying #54 -78 #54 -39 Motions to Exclude; grantng #54 -87 Motion to Exclude Spiegelburg. See order for specifics. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 29, 2021. (src) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) STATUS REPORT [Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Documents to be Downloaded by Court Clerk and Pending Motions] by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jackson, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part #40 Motion for Summary Judgment. See order regarding counts. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 2, 2021. (src) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 6/1/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann.Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to ELWsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on March 1, 2021. (rg) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER:STATUS CONFERENCE set for 4/8/2021 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks.FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 7/13/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks.JURY TRIAL set for 7/19/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 1, 2021. (slc) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by David C. DeGreeff on behalf of Kent Wilichowski, Kimberly Wilichowski. (DeGreeff, David) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #69 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David C. DeGreeff is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 16, 2021. (slc) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) MOTION for Attorney David C. DeGreeff to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2335289) by Kent Wilichowski, Kimberly Wilichowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Keith, Sean) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MASTER ANSWER to #67 Plaintiffs' Long Form Complaint with Jury Demand by Boston Scientific Corporation.(src) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) MASTER LONG FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Boston Scientific Corporation, filed by Plaintiffs. Originally filed in WVSD case 2:12md2326 on 9/26/12(src) (Entered: 02/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 10/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2326 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2326 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 8/15/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; Cases on inactive docket) (lca) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Boston Scientific Corporation have reached a settlement. The court ORDERS as follows: All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to place this case on the pending inactive docket. Plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 8/31/2018; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiff(s) and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties show good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 6410 in MDL Case No. 2326 Boston. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/20/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 187 (Amended Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) Because the court has determined there was confusion as to expert deadlines, changes have been made to Paragraph A of PTO # 175. The parties are advised that while this order will be entered in the individual cases in the coming days, it is effective as of the day it was entered in the main MDL. The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 4 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 03/19/2018; Defendant Fact Sheets due by 04/19/2018; Deadline for written discovery requests due by 05/18/2018; Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 07/13/2018; Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/13/2018; Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 08/20/2018; Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 10/04/2018; Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 10/18/2018; Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/25/2018; Reply to response to Dispositive motions due by 11/01/2018; Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/18/2018; Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/25/2018; and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 11/01/2018. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/13/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases) (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 06/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Kent Wilichowski, Kimberly Wilichowski. (Keith, Sean) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 06/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon Strongman on 1/22/15. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 1/19/2015, answer due 3/20/2015. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 01/23/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Michael Bonasso on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Bonasso, Michael) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 01/09/2015)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 118 (Order Scheduling Meetings in MDLs on January 29-30, 2015) entered on 12/18/2014 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (kw) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3583257. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ham) [Transferred from wvsd on 2/4/2021.] (Entered: 12/19/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David C. DeGreeff

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sean T. Keith

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Kuntz