This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:27:03 (UTC).

Wiley v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Wiley filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Roy B. Dalton, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02297

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Roy B. Dalton, Jr.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Ronald Wiley

Lompoc, CA 93436

Respondent

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Shawn P. Napier

Attorney at US Attorney's Office - FLM*

Suite 3100, 400 W Washington St

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:18-cr-94-Orl-37GJK filed by Ronald Wiley.(LDJ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:18-cr-94-Orl-37GJK, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronald Wiley. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:18-cr-94-Orl-37GJK by Ronald Wiley. (LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER denying #2 Motion to appoint counsel ; granting #2 motion to amend/correct; denying request for copies. Petitioner shall have TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order to Amend his Motion to Vacate. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 1/2/2020. (ALL) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:18-cr-94-Orl-37GJK by Ronald Wiley. (LDJ) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER denying #2 Motion to appoint counsel ; granting #2 motion to amend/correct; denying request for copies. Petitioner shall have TWENTY-ONE (21) DAYS from the date of this Order to Amend his Motion to Vacate. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A Baker on 1/2/2020. (ALL) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:18-cr-94-Orl-37GJK, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ronald Wiley. (BIA) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Criminal Case No. 6:18-cr-94-Orl-37GJK filed by Ronald Wiley.(LDJ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.