This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:35:37 (UTC).

Wildearth Guardians et al v. Skipwith et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Wildearth Guardians filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Skipwith. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dana L. Christensen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:20-CV-00097

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dana L. Christensen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wildearth Guardians

Wilderness Watch

Wilderness Workshop

Defendants

United States Fish and Wildlife Service

Aurelia Skipwith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Kellogg Bishop

Attorney at Western Environmental Law Center

103 Reeder'S Alley

Helena, MT 59601

Sarah K. McMillan

Attorney at WILDEARTH GUARDIANS - MISSOULA

117 W. Broadway, Po Box 7516

Missoula, MT 59801

John R. Mellgren

Attorney at WESTERN ENVIRONMENTAL LAW CENTER - EUGENE

120 Shelton Mcmurphey Blvd., Ste. 340

Eugene, OR 97401

Defendant Attorney

Michelle Margaret Spatz

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Margaret Spatz on behalf of All Defendants (Spatz, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

8 #1

USFWS Summons and Certified Mail Receipts

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 USFWS Summons and Certified Mail Receipts) (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

7 #1

Skipwith Summons and Certified Mail Receipts

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. Aurelia Skipwith served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Skipwith Summons and Certified Mail Receipts) (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mellgren, John) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney John R. Mellgren for Wildearth Guardians and Wilderness Workshop. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/6/2020. (ASG) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

4 #1

declaration re: PHV

#4

(#4) MOTION John R. Mellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2504737.) Sarah K. McMillan appearing for Plaintiffs Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 declaration re: PHV) (McMillan, Sarah) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Aurelia Skipwith, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Originals mailed to counsel for plaintiffs (TAG) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (TAG) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Modified to correct plaintiffs.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Margaret Spatz on behalf of All Defendants (Spatz, Michelle) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. United States Fish and Wildlife Service served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 USFWS Summons and Certified Mail Receipts) (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. Aurelia Skipwith served on 7/9/2020, answer due 9/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Skipwith Summons and Certified Mail Receipts) (Mellgren, John) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop re #5 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Mellgren, John) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney John R. Mellgren for Wildearth Guardians and Wilderness Workshop. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 7/6/2020. (ASG) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS). (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION John R. Mellgren to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 255 receipt number 0977-2504737.) Sarah K. McMillan appearing for Plaintiffs Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop (Attachments: #1 declaration re: PHV) (McMillan, Sarah) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Aurelia Skipwith, United States Fish and Wildlife Service. Originals mailed to counsel for plaintiffs (TAG) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wildearth Guardians, Wilderness Workshop. (TAG) (Plaintiffs updated.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2504592 (TAG) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Wilderness Workshop, Wildearth Guardians. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (TAG) (Modified to correct plaintiffs.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less