This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 07:41:39 (UTC).

Wildcat Licensing WI LLC v. Lear Corporation, et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 Wildcat Licensing WI LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Lear Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00845

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wildcat Licensing WI LLC

Defendants

Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC

Lear Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen B. Brauerman

Attorney at Bayard, P.A.

600 N. King Street, Suite 400

Wilmington, DE 19801

Vincent M. Ferraro

Harold S. Laidlaw

Peter F. Snell

Brad M. Scheller

Defendant Attorneys

Todd W. Dishman

John M. Halan

Frank A. Angileri

Kenneth Laurence Dorsney

Attorney at Morris James LLP

500 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1500, P.O. Box 2306

Wilmington, DE 19899-2306

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC for Lear Corporation filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, John M. Halan and Todd W. Dishman - filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. Lear Corporation served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE47,220; RE47,232. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

5 #4

Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Harold S. Laidlaw

5 #3

Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Vincent M. Ferraro

5 #2

Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Brad M. Scheller

5 #1

Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Peter F. Snell

#5

(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter F. Snell, Esquire, Brad M. Scheller, Esquire, Vincent M. Ferraro, Esquire, and Harold S. Laidlaw, Esquire - filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Peter F. Snell, #2 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Brad M. Scheller, #3 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Vincent M. Ferraro, #4 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Harold S. Laidlaw)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC for Lear Corporation filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation.(Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorneys Frank A. Angileri, Todd W. Dishman, and John M. Halan for Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC and Lear Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (ddp) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, John M. Halan and Todd W. Dishman filed by Lear Corporation, Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/24/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SO ORDERED re #8 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Lear Corporation and Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 27, 2019 (Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC answer due 6/27/2019; Lear Corporation answer due 6/27/2019). ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/24/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Frank A. Angileri, John M. Halan and Todd W. Dishman - filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendants Lear Corporation and Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to June 27, 2019 - filed by Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation. (Dorsney, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Peter F. Snell for Wildcat Licensing WI LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00833-MN et al.(ddp) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Pro Hac Vice Attorney Vincent M. Ferraro,Harold S. Laidlaw,Brad M. Scheller for Wildcat Licensing WI LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (lak) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • SO ORDERED re (7 in 1:19-cv-00834-MN, 6 in 1:19-cv-00843-MN, 11 in 1:19-cv-00846-MN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00844-MN, 12 in 1:19-cv-00839-MN, 5 in 1:19-cv-00833-MN, 6 in 1:19-cv-00840-MN, 6 in 1:19-cv-00842-MN, 7 in 1:19-cv-00845-MN) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter F. Snell, Esquire, Brad M. Scheller, Esquire, Vincent M. Ferraro, Esquire, and Harold S. Laidlaw, Esquire filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. ORDERED by Judge Maryellen Noreika on 5/14/2019. (dlw) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Peter F. Snell, Esquire, Brad M. Scheller, Esquire, Vincent M. Ferraro, Esquire, and Harold S. Laidlaw, Esquire - filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Peter F. Snell, #2 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Brad M. Scheller, #3 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Vincent M. Ferraro, #4 Certification by Counsel To Be Admitted Pro Hac Vice for Harold S. Laidlaw)(Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. Lear Corporation served on 5/7/2019, answer due 5/28/2019. (Brauerman, Stephen) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00833-MN, 1:19-cv-00834-MN, 1:19-cv-00839-MN, 1:19-cv-00840-MN and 1:19-cv-00842-MN through 1:19-cv-00846-MN (rjb) (Entered: 05/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC on 5/7/2019; Lear Corporation on 5/7/2019. Requesting party or attorney should pick up issued summons at the Help Desk, Room 4209, or call 302-573-6170 and ask the Clerk to mail the summons to them. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: No Parents or Affiliates Listed filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) RE47,220; RE47,232. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Lear Automotive Manufacturing, LLC, Lear Corporation - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2635408.) - filed by Wildcat Licensing WI LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceg) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less