This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2020 at 09:13:49 (UTC).

WILCOX et al v. SMITH

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 WILCOX filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SMITH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joel Schneider and Joseph H. Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-09005

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joel Schneider

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MELISSA WILCOX

RICHARD WILCOX

Defendant

MATTHEW SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KEVIN M. BLAKE

Attorney at BENNETT, BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLC

960 Harvest Lane, Building B, Suite 100, 67-654-1104

Blue Bell, PA 19422

Defendant Attorney

COLLEEN M. READY

Attorney at MARGOLIS EDELSTEIN

100 Century Parkway, Suite 200

Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/31/2020. (dmr) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

#4

(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 03:30 PM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/7/2020. (tf, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MATTHEW SMITH.(READY, COLLEEN) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MATTHEW SMITH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11084830) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICHARD WILCOX, MELISSA WILCOX.(BLAKE, KEVIN) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Administratively Terminating Action - 60 Day, Pending Consummation of Settlement. Administrative Termination deadline set for 10/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/31/2020. (dmr) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER: The initial conference currently scheduled for September 2, 2020 is hereby moved to October 9, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. The call-in and access code remain unchanged. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/27/20. (Shaw, A) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: The Court is prepared to go forward with the initial conference scheduled on September 2, 2020 at 3:30 p.m. via telephone. The call-in number for the call is 1-888-684-8852, access code 3436790#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/21/20. (Shaw, A). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Initial Conference set for 9/2/2020 03:30 PM in Camden - Room 2060 before Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider on 8/7/2020. (tf, ) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by MATTHEW SMITH.(READY, COLLEEN) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action, In the future when selecting parties, select each party individually. DO NOT select All Plaintiffs or All Defendants. The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to MATTHEW SMITH. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Arbitration. (cry, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketJudge Joseph H. Rodriguez and Magistrate Judge Joel Schneider added. (dd, ) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-11084830) with JURY DEMAND, filed by RICHARD WILCOX, MELISSA WILCOX.(BLAKE, KEVIN) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COLLEEN M. READY(Designation Retained)