This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2020 at 11:17:41 (UTC).

Wilco Life Insurance Company v. Hamby et al.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2020 Wilco Life Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hamby. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. P. Boulee. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02688

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. P. Boulee

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wilco Life Insurance Company

Defendants

Victor Hamby

Kathleen Allen Shull

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jamie L. Moore

Attorney at Bradley Arant Boult Cummings, LLP-B. AL

One Federal Place, 1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203-2119

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Kathleen Allen Shull waiver mailed on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Victor Hamby waiver mailed on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#8

(#8) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

#7

(#7) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Wilton Reassurance Company for Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

2 #1

Summons Kathleen Allen Shull

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Victor Hamby, Kathleen Allen Shull. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Kathleen Allen Shull)(rvb) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9839264.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/27/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 08/03/2020. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Kathleen Allen Shull waiver mailed on 7/6/2020, answer due 9/4/2020. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. Victor Hamby waiver mailed on 6/29/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #5 MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) , to District Judge J. P. Boulee. (ddm) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020 (mmc) (ADI) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FOURTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 07/01/2020. (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on 7/1/20. (bnw) (Entered: 07/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerks Notation re #4 Certificate of Interested Persons APPROVED by JPB. (bnw) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wilco Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Wilton Reassurance Company for Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Moore, Jamie) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) THIRD AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONA VIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 05/26/2020. (rvb) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Victor Hamby, Kathleen Allen Shull. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Kathleen Allen Shull)(rvb) (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT, filed by Wilco Life Insurance Company. (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9839264.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(rvb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wilco Life Insurance Company is a litigant