This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 09:27:36 (UTC).

Wilcher v. Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Wilcher filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn, Jr and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

Referral Judge

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Al Malik Wilcher

Defendant

Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

J. Michael Malone

Attorney at Hendren & Malone, PLLC

4600 Marriott Drive, Suite 150

Raleigh, NC 27612

Defendant Attorneys

Allen C. Smith

Attorney at Hedrick, Eatman, Gardner & Kincheloe

Po Box 30397

Charlotte, NC 28230

Mary Katherine Harris

Attorney at Hedrick, Gardner, Kincheloe & Garofalo

4201 Congress Street, Suite 300

Charlotte, NC 28209

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit Letter

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Allen C. Smith on behalf of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company (Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Katherine Harris on behalf of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company (Harris, Mary) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Al Malik Wilcher (Malone, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company.(Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Smith, Allen) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#8

(#8) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 2-3 days. Discovery due by 11/3/2023. Motions due by 12/1/2023. Mediation deadline set for 11/17/2023. Ready Date for Trial set for 2/20/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/2/23. (mga) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 2-3 days. Discovery due by 11/3/2023. Motions due by 12/1/2023. Mediation deadline set for 11/17/2023. Ready Date for Trial set for 2/20/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom #5A, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/2/23. (mga) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Smith, Allen) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketNOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/9/2023. (ams) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company.(Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by J. Michael Malone on behalf of Al Malik Wilcher (Malone, J.) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Katherine Harris on behalf of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company (Harris, Mary) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(cjs) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Allen C. Smith on behalf of Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company (Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCWDC-5893887), filed by Progressive Southeastern Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter)(Smith, Allen) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less