This case was last updated from PACER on 08/28/2021 at 09:38:04 (UTC).

Wilbanks v. Covidien LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2021 Wilbanks filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Covidien LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Herman N Johnson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00887

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Herman N Johnson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Wilbanks

Defendants

Medtronic Inc

Covidien LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Richard L Collins

Attorney at COLLINS LAW OFFICES, P.C.

P.O. Box 669

Cullman, AL 35056

Defendant Attorney

Lindsey C Boney, IV

Attorney at BRADLEY ARANT BOULT CUMMINGS

1819 Fifth Avenue North

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Plead Motion is RIPE 8/17/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic Inc. (Boney, Lindsey) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Covidien LP served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021; Medtronic Inc served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Covidien LP and Medtronic Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#3

(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Pamela Wilbanks. (Collins, Richard) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Pamela Wilbanks.(BJL) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Covidien LP and Medtronic Inc shall file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 7, 2021.Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on August 17, 2021. (HKM) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Plead Motion is RIPE 8/17/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Covidien LP, Medtronic Inc. (Boney, Lindsey) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed Covidien LP served on 7/30/2021, answer due 8/20/2021; Medtronic Inc served on 8/2/2021, answer due 8/23/2021. (AHI) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Covidien LP and Medtronic Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for service by certified mail filed by Pamela Wilbanks. (Collins, Richard) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3881165 (B4601114552). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Pamela Wilbanks.(BJL). (Collins, Richard) Modified on 7/13/2021 (AHI). (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Pamela Wilbanks.(BJL) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COVIDIEN LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant