This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/03/2021 at 09:32:10 (UTC).

Wiggs v. Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/04/2020 Wiggs filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Deborah M Fine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-08287

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Deborah M Fine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grant Wiggs

Defendants

Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC

Martha MeKeel

Scott Stanford

Dennis McCormick

Deborah McCormick

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Jacob Bendau

Attorney at Bendau Law Firm

P.O. Box 97066

Phoenix, AZ 85060

Clifford Phillip Bendau, II

Attorney at Bendau Law Firm

P.O. Box 97066

Phoenix, AZ 85060

Defendant Attorney

Robert Allen Miller

Attorney at Robert A Miller PLC

450 W Goodwin, Ste. 107

Prescott, AZ 86303

 

Court Documents

20 #1

Exhibit A, first amended complaint (track changes)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Grant Wiggs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, first amended complaint (track changes))(Bendau, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#19

(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford filed by Grant Wiggs.(Bendau, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 12/10/2020. (LAD) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#13

(#13) * NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Allen Miller on behalf of Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford. (Miller, Robert) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 12/9/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#12

(#12) * Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford.(Miller, Robert) * Document not in compliance with Local Rules; attorney noticed on 12/9/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#11

(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Martha MeKeel on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#10

(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Scott Stanford on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#9

(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Deborah McCormick on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#8

(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Dennis McCormick on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

#7

(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

4 #4

Summons

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/05/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18848068 filed by Grant Wiggs. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading pursuant to LRCiv 15.1(b) by Grant Wiggs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, first amended complaint (track changes))(Bendau, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford filed by Grant Wiggs.(Bendau, Christopher) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 1/20/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (See document for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 12/10/2020. (LAD) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • Docket(#16) Minute Order: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #12 Answer to Complaint filed by Deborah McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford, Dennis McCormick, Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, #13 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel filed by Deborah McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford, Dennis McCormick, Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC. Document #12 not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(c) - Documents shall be converted to PDF directly from a word processing program and per Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual must be text searchable. Documents #12 and #13 not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. Please note for future filings. No further action is required. It is not necessary to refile. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LAD) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • Docket(#15) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) * NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Allen Miller on behalf of Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford. (Miller, Robert) * Document not in compliance with Local Rule; attorney noticed on 12/9/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) * Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford.(Miller, Robert) * Document not in compliance with Local Rules; attorney noticed on 12/9/2020 (LAD). (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Martha MeKeel on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Scott Stanford on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Deborah McCormick on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Dennis McCormick on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Grant Wiggs: Proof of Service re: Complaint and Summons upon Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC on 11/18/2020. (Bendau, Clifford) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • Docket(#6) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 11/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Historic Palace Saloon and Restaurant LLC, Deborah McCormick, Dennis McCormick, Martha MeKeel, Scott Stanford. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-18848068. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Deborah M. Fine. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-20-08287-PCT-DMF. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form) (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Grant Wiggs. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-18848068 filed by Grant Wiggs. (submitted by Clifford Bendau) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (REK) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Jacob Bendau

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clifford Phillip Bendau, II