Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2019 at 07:58:13 (UTC).

Wiggins v. Fudge et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2019 Wiggins filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Fudge. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Scott L. Palk and Gary M. Purcell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00536

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

Referral Judge

Gary M. Purcell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darrell Lamar Wiggins

Sayre, OK 73662

Defendants

Esq C Allen McCall

Robert Macy

Delynn Fudge

Roberta Robbie Fullerton

Tom Gillert

Michael Kris Steele

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint no later than August 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/25/2019. (cps) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#11

(#11) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/25/2019. (cps) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendation and re-referring the matter to United States Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/23/2019. (md) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#9

(#9) Receipt for Money Received from Darrell Lamar Wiggins in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500075151 regarding #1 Complaint, (rb) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

8 #1

Envelope

#8

(#8) MOTION for Discovery and to Produce Documents by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : IT is recommended the motion for leave to re Doc. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 6/19/2019. (cps) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

1 #11

Envelope

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - Excerpt for Swift Parole Under New Law

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - Investigative Report Interview (03-02-09)

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - CIV-17-908-SLP Order

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Pardon and Parole Board Procedure Manual

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Delynn Fudge(in official capacity as Executive Director of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Delynn Fudge(individually), Roberta Robbie Fullerton(individually), Roberta Robbie Fullerton(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Tom Gillert(Individually), Tom Gillert(in official capacity as Chairman of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Robert Macy(individually), Robert Macy(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), C Allen McCall(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), C Allen McCall(individually), Michael Kris Steele(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Michael Kris Steele(individually) filed by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pardon and Parole Board Procedure Manual, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board, #4 Exhibit 4 - Investigative Report (04-03-18), #5 Exhibit 5 - Investigative Report (04-08-15), #6 Exhibit 6 - CIV-17-908-SLP Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Investigative Report Interview (03-02-09), #8 Exhibit 8 - Westlaw.com Excerpt, #9 Exhibit 9 - Title 57 Prisons and Reformatories Statute, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt for Swift Parole Under New Law, #11 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #7 Motion to Amend/Correct. Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint no later than August 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/25/2019. (cps) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 7/25/2019. (cps) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell added. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. (md) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; adopting Report and Recommendations re #6 Report and Recommendation and re-referring the matter to United States Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Signed by Honorable Scott L. Palk on 7/23/2019. (md) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Receipt for Money Received from Darrell Lamar Wiggins in the amount of $400.00, receipt number OKW500075151 regarding #1 Complaint, (rb) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Discovery and to Produce Documents by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(rb) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell no longer assigned to case. (cps) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION : IT is recommended the motion for leave to re Doc. #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis be denied. Objections to R&R due by 7/9/2019. This Report and Recommendation disposes of all issues referred to the undersigned Magistrate Judge in the captioned matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell on 6/19/2019. (cps) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Mailing LCvR5.4/Change of Address form, doc #1 COMPLAINT, doc #4 ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE, and doc #5 ENTER ORDER REFFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell to Darrell Lamar Wiggins #155255 SAYRE-NFCC 1605 E Main Sayre, OK 73662 (ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Gary M. Purcell. Motions referred to Gary M. Purcell. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 06/11/2019. (ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Scott L. Palk for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles Goodwin no longer assigned to case. Entered at the direction of the Honorable Charles Goodwin on 06/11/2019. (ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PREVIOUS Cases. (ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Delynn Fudge(in official capacity as Executive Director of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Delynn Fudge(individually), Roberta Robbie Fullerton(individually), Roberta Robbie Fullerton(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Tom Gillert(Individually), Tom Gillert(in official capacity as Chairman of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Robert Macy(individually), Robert Macy(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), C Allen McCall(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), C Allen McCall(individually), Michael Kris Steele(in official capacity as Member of the Oklahoma Pardon and Parole Board), Michael Kris Steele(individually) filed by Darrell Lamar Wiggins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pardon and Parole Board Procedure Manual, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board, #3 Exhibit 3 - Letter to Pardon and Parole Board, #4 Exhibit 4 - Investigative Report (04-03-18), #5 Exhibit 5 - Investigative Report (04-08-15), #6 Exhibit 6 - CIV-17-908-SLP Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - Investigative Report Interview (03-02-09), #8 Exhibit 8 - Westlaw.com Excerpt, #9 Exhibit 9 - Title 57 Prisons and Reformatories Statute, #10 Exhibit 10 - Excerpt for Swift Parole Under New Law, #11 Envelope)(ank) (Entered: 06/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less