This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:10:37 (UTC).

Wigge v. AT&T Inc et al

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Wigge filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Holly A Brady and Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Holly A Brady

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Wigge

Fort Wayne, IN 46818

Defendants

AT&T

Jon Sablan

AT&T Inc

AT&T Mobility Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer L Hitchcock

Attorney at Close & Hitchcock LLP

116 E Berry St Ste 625

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorney

Emery K Harlan

Attorney at MWH Law Group LLP - Ind/IN

8206 Rockville Rd #321

Indianapolis, IN 46214

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint by AT&T Mobility Services LLC Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. (Harlan, Emery) Modified on 6/10/2022 (mr). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#22

(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Mobility Services LLC for AT&T Mobility Services LLC.. (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#21

(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 07/11/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 04/10/2023. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a) (2) are due from Plaintiff by 12/12/2022; and from Defendants by 01/12/2023. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 07/21/2022; as to Defendant is 08/19/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 05/10/2023, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties shall name a mediator no later than 07/08/2022. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator, or if none is named, the Court will appoint a mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 06/09/2022. (sej) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#14

RESTRICTED

#12

(#17) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Dft granted to and including 6/9/2022 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

9 #3

Exhibit B

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Exhibit 1

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of Kimberly Wigge (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#4

(#6) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #4 Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is granted. Defendants granted to and including 4/29/2022 to file an Answer to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of All Defendants (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Defendant's Answer to First Amended Complaint by AT&T Mobility Services LLC Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses. (Harlan, Emery) Modified on 6/10/2022 (mr). (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Mobility Services LLC for AT&T Mobility Services LLC.. (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 07/11/2022. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 04/10/2023. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a) (2) are due from Plaintiff by 12/12/2022; and from Defendants by 01/12/2023. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 07/21/2022; as to Defendant is 08/19/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 05/10/2023, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties shall name a mediator no later than 07/08/2022. If the parties cannot agree upon a mediator, or if none is named, the Court will appoint a mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 06/09/2022. (sej) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/9/2022 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Jennifer Hitchcock. Dfts appeared by atty Emery Harlan. Parties request the deadlines proposed in the #15 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting be extended by 30 days. Court grants the Parties' request and approves the report (except establishment of a trial date) with extended deadlines. Parties are to file a Notice with the Court by 7/8/2022 advising of their selection of a Mediator. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • Docket(#19) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pursuant to the request of Defendant, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2022 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 6/9/2022 at 11:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 05/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • Docket(#18) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to attorney Emery Harlan's unavailability, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 5/18/2022 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #12 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Dft granted to and including 6/9/2022 to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 05/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to DE #15 the parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 (sej) Modified on 5/9/2022 (kms). (Entered: 05/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Issued as to AT&T Mobility Services LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld) (Entered: 05/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kimberly Wigge. Plaintiff is afforded to and including 4/28/2022, to file the amended complaint (ECF 9-1) and its attached exhibits (ECF 9-2, 9-3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 4/21/2022. (asd) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Kimberly Wigge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/10/2022 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #4 Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is granted. Defendants granted to and including 4/29/2022 to file an Answer to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Hitchcock on behalf of Kimberly Wigge (Hitchcock, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading by Defendants AT&T Inc, Jon Sablan. (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Emery K Harlan on behalf of All Defendants (Harlan, Emery) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc, Jon Sablan. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc) Modified on 3/31/2022 to correct Dft name (lns). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc, Jon Sablan (Filing fee $ 402.00.) Receipt #INN1013584, filed by Kimberly Wigge. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons)(lhc) Modified on 3/31/2022 to correct Dft name (lns). (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AT&T Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Mobility LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emery K Harlan