This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/20/2022 at 08:09:39 (UTC).

Wiesblatt Licensing LLC v. Razer USA Ltd.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2022 Wiesblatt Licensing LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Razer USA Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Fred Biery. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00990

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fred Biery

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wiesblatt Licensing LLC

Defendant

Razer USA Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rene A. Vazquez

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson Street

Tyler, TX 75702

Christopher A. Honea

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75702

M. Scott Fuller

Attorney at Garteiser Honea

119 W. Ferguson

Tyler, TX 75702

Randall T. Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea, PLLC

119 W. Ferguson St

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Kao

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

4 Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-5998

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Wiesblatt Licensing LLC. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Razer USA Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wiesblatt Licensing LLC. Razer USA Ltd. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Honea, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Razer USA Ltd.. (Kao, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Razer USA Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kao, Christopher) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFICIENCY NOTICE: re #6 Stipulation. Please be advise that this should be filed as a Motion. Please refile using the correct event entry and include a Proposed Order. Thank you. (zv) (Entered: 10/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Razer USA Ltd.. (Kao, Christopher) (Entered: 10/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wiesblatt Licensing LLC. Razer USA Ltd. served on 10/5/2022, answer due 10/26/2022. (Honea, Christopher) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Razer USA Ltd.. (lad) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Fred Biery pursuant to the Order Assigning Business of the Court as it Relates to Patent Cases, filed 7/25/2022. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Wiesblatt Licensing LLC. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16551319), filed by Wiesblatt Licensing LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 09/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Razer USA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher Kao