This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 08:06:50

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 05/16/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Wierenga against Crestwood Medical Center in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 5:19-CV-00748
  • Filing Date 05/16/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Civil Right - Employment Discrimination
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr
  • Courthouse Alabama Northern District

Party Details

  • Plaintiff Rebecca Wierenga
  • Represented By
    • Hube H Dodd, Jr
    • Willard Brent Woodall
  • Defendant Rita Wallace
  • Represented By
    • Anne Knox Averitt
    • John W Hargrove
  • Defendant Geocobi Nnadi
  • Represented By
    • Anne Knox Averitt
    • John W Hargrove
  • Defendant Crestwood Medical Center
  • Represented By
    • Anne Knox Averitt
    • John W Hargrove

Court Documents

#14

(#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with...

Fees Apply
#13

(#13) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimo...

Fees Apply
#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Hube H Dodd, Jr on behalf of R...

Fees Apply
#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hargrove, John...

Fees Apply
#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hargrove, John...

Fees Apply
#9

(#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIACE WITH RULE 26 that the parties...

Fees Apply
#8

(#8) ORDER that the parties are required to enter an electio...

Fees Apply
#7

(#7) ORDER that that action is set for a Telephone Conferenc...

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geocobi Nnadi. filed ...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rita Wallace. filed b...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Crestwood Medical Center, Geocob...

Fees Apply
#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crestwood Medical Cen...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • (#14) INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 7/2/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
  • 07/02/2019
  • (#13) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this civil action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Liles C. Burke. Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. Please use case number 5:19-cv-748-HNJ on all subsequent pleadings. (BJL) (Entered: 07/02/2019)
  • 06/28/2019
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Hube H Dodd, Jr on behalf of Rebecca Wierenga (Dodd, Hube) (Entered: 06/28/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hargrove, John) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 06/24/2019
  • (#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hargrove, John) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#9) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIACE WITH RULE 26 that the parties must confer no later than 21 days after this order as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/20/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#8) ORDER that the parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than July 1, 2019; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after order July 1, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/20/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/20/2019
  • (#7) ORDER that that action is set for a Telephone Conference on 6/18/2019 09:15 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/20/2019. (AHI) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number B4601097766 (AHI) (Entered: 05/20/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Geocobi Nnadi. filed by Geocobi Nnadi (Hargrove, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rita Wallace. filed by Rita Wallace (Hargrove, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint by Crestwood Medical Center, Geocobi Nnadi, Rita Wallace.(Hargrove, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crestwood Medical Center. filed by Crestwood Medical Center (Hargrove, John) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/17/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL) (Entered: 05/17/2019)
  • 05/16/2019
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Geocobi Nnadi, Crestwood Medical Center and Rita Wallace from The Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-CV-2019-900757. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(BJL) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.