This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2022 at 18:08:16 (UTC).

WIENER v. VIGNES, ET AL

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 WIENER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIGNES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tanya Walton Pratt and Matthew P. Brookman. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04760

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tanya Walton Pratt

Referral Judge

Matthew P. Brookman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAY WIENER

Defendants

DAVID VIGNES

ADESA INC.

KAR AUCTION SERVICES INC.

AUTOMOTIVE KEY CONTROLS, LLC

HIGH TECH NATIONAL, LLC a limited liability company doing business as HIGH TECH LOCKSMITHS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marianne Curtis

Attorney at BERGER SINGERMAN LLP

350 East Las Olas Blvd., Suite 1000

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33301

Leonard Keith Samuels

Attorney at Berger Singerman LLP

350 E Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 1000

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

Dane Andrew Mize

Attorney at SKILES DETRUDE

150 East Market Street, Suite 200

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Defendant Attorneys

Joyce Ackerbaum Cox

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler

200 S Orange Avenue, Suite 2300 Po Box 112

Orlando, FL 32802-0112

Casie D. Collignon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP

1801 California Street, Suite 4400

Denver, CO 80202

Bryan K. Clark

Attorney at VEDDER PRICE P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Blaine C. Kimrey

Attorney at VEDDER PRICE P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Jonathon P. Reinisch

Attorney at VEDDER PRICE P.C.

222 North Lasalle Street

Chicago, IL 60601

Dana Jane McElroy

Attorney at Thomas & LoCicero PL

915 Middle River Drive, Suite 309

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33304

 

Court Documents

#40

39 #3

Exhibit C - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

39 #2

Exhibit B - Indiana Civil Docket

39 #1

Exhibit A - Florida Civil Docket

#39

#38

#37

36 #1

*Restricted*

#36

#5

#4

#3

1 #5

Exhibit Exh. C: Lease

1 #4

Exhibit Exh. B: 2015 Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Exh. A: 2013 Agreement

1 #2

Summon(s) proposed summonses

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MARGINAL ENTRY - Acknowledging #39 PLAINTIFF JAY WIENER'S NOTICE OF FILING PREVIOUSLY FILED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 12/9/2019.(NAD) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE OF FILING PREVIOUSLY FILED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE, filed by Plaintiff JAY WIENER (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Florida Civil Docket, #2 Exhibit B - Indiana Civil Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (Mize, Dane) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) NOTICE of Appearance by Dane Andrew Mize on behalf of Plaintiff JAY WIENER. (Mize, Dane) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (NAD) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-23884. Original file copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) ORDER granting in part and denying in part #12 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk of Court is DIRECTED TO TRANSFER this action the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/3/2019. See attached document for full details. (pes) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER STRIKING #32 Notice (Other), filed by Jay Wiener Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE by Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc., David Vignes re #32 Notice (Other), Response to Plaintiffs Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority (McElroy, Dana) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) STRICKEN PER ORDER DE#34 -NOTICE by Jay Wiener re #26 Response in Opposition to Motion,, NOTICE OF FILING SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS, TRANSFER OR STAY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: 11/26/2019 Order GRANTING Defendants' Joint Motion to Transfer entered in the USDC, Southern District of Indiana, Case No. 19-cv-02489-SEB-MJD) (Samuels, Leonard) Modified on 12/3/2019 (drz). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Jay Wiener (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Samuels, Leonard) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joyce Ackerbaum Cox on behalf of David Vignes. Attorney Joyce Ackerbaum Cox added to party David Vignes(pty:dft). (Ackerbaum Cox, Joyce) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #8 Order to Show Cause by Jay Wiener. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service re HTL, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service re AKC, #3 Exhibit C - Return of Service re KAR, #4 Exhibit D - Return of Service re Adesa, #5 Exhibit E - USPS Certified Mail Return Receipt re David Vignes, #6 Exhibit F - Return of no service re David Vignes, #7 Exhibit G - email from counsel, #8 Exhibit H - email from counsel)(Samuels, Leonard) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/15/2019. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 10/8/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Scheduling Report due by 11/1/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER denying #5 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 9/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Plaintiff's MOTION to Consolidate Cases PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATE CASE by Jay Wiener. Responses due by 10/7/2019 (Samuels, Leonard) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jay Wiener (Samuels, Leonard) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Adesa, Inc., Automotive Key Controls, LLC, High Tech National LLC, KAR Auction Services, Inc., David Vignes. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11991909, filed by Jay Wiener. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) proposed summonses, #3 Exhibit Exh. A: 2013 Agreement, #4 Exhibit Exh. B: 2015 Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exh. C: Lease)(Samuels, Leonard) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 12/4/2019.] (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Automotive Key Controls, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGH TECH NATIONAL, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where KAR Auction Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Adesa, Inc. is a litigant