This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/19/2021 at 09:43:32 (UTC).

Wiegand v. Garipalli et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Wiegand filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Garipalli. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01053

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eric Wiegand

Defendants

Vivek Garipalli

Andrew Toy

Joseph Wagner

Lee Shapiro

Chamath Palihapitiya

Steven Trieu

Ian Osborne

Jacqueline D. Reses

James Ryans

Nathaniel S. Turner

Nominal Defendant

Clover Health Investments, Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ryan M. Ernst

Attorney at Bielli & Klauder, LLC

1204 N. Market Street

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Verification

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Exhibit

3 #2

Exhibit

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase associated with lead case: Create association to 1:21-cv-00191-LPS -- All papers shall be filed in lead case no. 21-191-LPS. (ntl) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re (5 in 1:21-cv-00191-LPS)(3 in 1:21-cv-01053-LPS) Joint Stipulation and Order Regarding Consolidation. 21-191-LPS is the lead case and all documents shall be filed in the lead case only. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 9/16/21. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00191-LPS, 1:21-cv-01053-LPS (ntl) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STIPULATION -- Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order -- by Eric Wiegand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ernst, Ryan) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNo Summons Issued. (myr) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (myr) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed against Clover Health Investments, Corp., Vivek Garipalli, Ian Osborne, Chamath Palihapitiya, Jacqueline D. Reses, James Ryans, Lee Shapiro, Andrew Toy, Steven Trieu, Nathaniel S. Turner, Joseph Wagner - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3662426.) - filed by Eric Wiegand. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(myr) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clover Health Investments, Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan M. Ernst