This case was last updated from PACER on 08/10/2021 at 09:12:43 (UTC).

Wiedel v. Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Wiedel filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Brentwood Extended Care Rehab, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald A. White and Jodi Warmbrod Dishman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00168

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Ronald A. White

Jodi Warmbrod Dishman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Elexia Wiedel

Defendants

Management Services, Inc. doing business as Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab

Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab, LLC doing business as Brentwood Nursing Home Extended Care and Rehabilitation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Donald E. Smolen, II

Attorney at Smolen Law, PLLC

611 S Detroit Ave

Tulsa, OK 74120

Defendant Attorneys

Madalene A.B. Witterholt

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (TUL)

321 S Boston, Ste 500

Tulsa, OK 74103-3313

Michael W. Bowling

Attorney at Crowe & Dunlevy (OKC)

324 N Robinson Ave, Ste 100

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-8273

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER by District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman. On August 3, 2021, Defendants filed a #8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Without expressing any view on the merits of the Motion, the Court reminds Plaintiff of her opportunity to attempt to cure any purported pleading defects by filing an amended complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) (B). See Order for all details. (Vasquez, Nyssa) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W. Bowling on behalf of All Defendants (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by All Defendants Responses due by 8/17/2021(Witterholt, Madalene) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Madalene A.B. Witterholt on behalf of All Defendants (Witterholt, Madalene) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Management Services, Inc. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab, LLC (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab, LLC, Management Services, Inc. by Elexia Wiedel (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Elexia Wiedel (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman. On August 3, 2021, Defendants filed a #8 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Without expressing any view on the merits of the Motion, the Court reminds Plaintiff of her opportunity to attempt to cure any purported pleading defects by filing an amended complaint in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1) (B). See Order for all details. (Vasquez, Nyssa) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael W. Bowling on behalf of All Defendants (Bowling, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Brief In Support by All Defendants Responses due by 8/17/2021(Witterholt, Madalene) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Madalene A.B. Witterholt on behalf of All Defendants (Witterholt, Madalene) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Jodi W. Dishman of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Section 292(b). All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-21-168-JWD. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Management Services, Inc. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab, LLC (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 6/11/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1516174 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Elexia Wiedel (Smolen, Donald) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $402 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov (Filing Fee due by 6/18/2021) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Brentwood Extended Care & Rehab, LLC, Management Services, Inc. by Elexia Wiedel (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Elexia Wiedel (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Management Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Donald Eugene Smolen, II