Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/28/2020 at 08:15:15 (UTC).

Wide Voice, LLC v. CenturyLink Communications, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 Wide Voice, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CenturyLink Communications, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gail J. Standish and Virginia A. Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06868

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

Presiding Judge

Virginia A. Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Wide Voice, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

CenturyLink Communications, LLC

MCI Communications Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Lucas Andrew Messenger

Attorney at Robins Kaplan LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 3400

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Lauren J. Coppola

800 Boylston Street Suite 2500

Boston, MA 02199

Timothy D. Wenger

800 Boylston Street Suite 2500

Boston, MA 02199

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Charles W. Steese

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

4643 South Ulster Street Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

Aaron C Gundzik

Attorney at Gundzik Gundzik Heeger LLP

14011 Ventura Boulevard Suite 206E

Sherman Oaks, CA 91423

Alec P. Harris

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

4643 South Ulster Street Suite 800

Denver, CO 80237

Gregory L Doll

Attorney at Doll Amir and Eley LLP

725 South Figueroa Street Suite 3275

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Grace W. Knofczynski

Attorney at Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel and Frederick PLLC

1615 M Street Nw Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Scott H. Angstreich

Attorney at Kellogg Hansen Todd Figel and Frederick PLLC

1615 M Street Nw Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#40

(#40) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #35 Non-Resident Attorney Steese, Charles W. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CenturyLink Communications, LLC, designating Gundzik, Aaron C. as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#39

(#39) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Grace W. Knofczynski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MCI Communications Services LLC, designating Gregory L. Doll as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#38

(#38) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Scott H. Angstreich APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MCI Communications Services LLC, designating Gregory L. Doll as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

(#35) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles W. Steese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28192270) filed by Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gundzik, Aaron) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

29 #1

Proposed Order

#29

(#32) TEXT ONLY NOTICE RE: Applications of Non-Resident Attorney #28 and #29 . In compliance with Local Rule 5-4.4, counsel shall email the applications in PDF format, and the proposed order in Microsoft Word or PDF Format, to the Judge's generic chambers email, no later than 4:00 p.m. of September 22, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#28

(#32) TEXT ONLY NOTICE RE: Applications of Non-Resident Attorney #28 and #29 . In compliance with Local Rule 5-4.4, counsel shall email the applications in PDF format, and the proposed order in Microsoft Word or PDF Format, to the Judge's generic chambers email, no later than 4:00 p.m. of September 22, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC, (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#1

(#10) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant MCI Communications Services LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #35 Non-Resident Attorney Steese, Charles W. APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of CenturyLink Communications, LLC, designating Gundzik, Aaron C. as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #29 Non-Resident Attorney Grace W. Knofczynski APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MCI Communications Services LLC, designating Gregory L. Doll as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #28 Non-Resident Attorney Scott H. Angstreich APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of MCI Communications Services LLC, designating Gregory L. Doll as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: granting #34 Non-Resident Attorney Alec P. Harris APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Century Link Communications LLC, designating Aaron C. Gundzik as local counsel. (yl) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Charles W. Steese to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28192270) filed by Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gundzik, Aaron) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Alec P. Harris to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28191483) filed by Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Gundzik, Aaron) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER ON STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTIONS AND MOTIONS by Judge Virginia A. Phillips #31 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: The Hearing is continued to November 2, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Wide Voices oppositions to the Motions, if any, shall be due on or before October 12, 2020. CenturyLink and Verizons replies in support of the Motions, if any, shall be due on or before October 19, 2020. (See order for further details) (yl) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) TEXT ONLY NOTICE RE: Applications of Non-Resident Attorney #28 and #29 . In compliance with Local Rule 5-4.4, counsel shall email the applications in PDF format, and the proposed order in Microsoft Word or PDF Format, to the Judge's generic chambers email, no later than 4:00 p.m. of September 22, 2020. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date from October 19, 2020 to November 2, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case and Refer Issues to Federal Communications Commission #23 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending the Resolution of Necessary Issues by the Federal Communications Commission #27 filed by plaintiff/counterclaim defendant Wide Voice, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coppola, Lauren) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant MCI Communications Services LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC, (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27434085 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Wide Voice, LLC. (Attorney Lucas Andrew Messenger added to party Wide Voice, LLC(pty:pla))(Messenger, Lucas) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MCI Communications Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTURYLINK COMMUNICATIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grace W. Knofczynski

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory L Doll