This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2020 at 08:18:13 (UTC).

Burton W. Wiand et al v. Paul R. Wassgren et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Burton W Wiand filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Paul R Wassgren. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-08849

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

EA SIP, LLC

Equialt Fund LLC

Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP

Equialt Fund II, LLC

Equialt Fund III, LLC

Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc.

Burton W Wiand

Burton W. Wiand

Defendants

DLA Piper LLP (US)

Paul R Wassgren

Fox Rothschild LLP

Paul R. Wassgren

DLA Piper LLP US

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kathy Bazoian Phelps

Attorney at Diamond McCarthy LLP

1999 Avenue Of The Stars 11Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2904

Scott C. Ilgenfritz

Attorney at Johnson Pope Boker Ruppel and Burns LLP

401 East Jacksosn Street Suite 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

Guy M. Burns

Attorney at Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel and Burns LLP

401 East Jackson Street Suite 3100

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

4 #1

Proposed Order

#5

5 #1

Proposed Order

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Equialt Fund III, LLC, Burton W. Wiand, EA SIP, LLC. upon Paul R. Wassgren waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/16/2020, answer due 12/15/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Simon A. Gaugush. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Equialt Fund III, LLC, Burton W. Wiand, EA SIP, LLC. upon DLA Piper LLP US waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John K. Villa. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Equialt Fund III, LLC, Burton W. Wiand, EA SIP, LLC. upon Fox Rothschild LLP waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/19/2020, answer due 12/18/2020. Waiver of Service signed by William J. Schifino. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Scott Ilgenfritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver on behalf of Equialt Fund, LLC; Equialt Fund II, LLC; Equialt Fund III, LLC; EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP; Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc.; and their investors, designating Kathy B. Phelps as local counsel #5 . (gk) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Guy M. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Burton W. Wiand, as Receiver on behalf of Equialt Fund, LLC; Equialt Fund II, LLC; Equialt Fund III, LLC; EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP; Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc.; and their investors, designating Kathy B. Phelps as local counsel #4 . (gk) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (lh) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Scott Ilgenfritz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Burton W Wiand (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28277559) filed by Plaintiffs EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Burton W Wiand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Guy M. Burns to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Burton W Wiand (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-28277419) filed by Plaintiffs EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Burton W Wiand. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketFILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. ACACDC-28277285 for $400 filing fee. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Burton W Wiand, (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs EA SIP, LLC, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Burton W Wiand. (Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($0 receipt number Pay.gov is down per clerk so unable to pay fee), filed by Plaintiffs Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP, Equialt Fund II, LLC, Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc., Equialt Fund LLC, Equialt Fund III, LLC, Burton W Wiand, EA SIP, LLC. (Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party EA SIP, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Equialt Fund II, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Equialt Fund III, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Equialt Fund LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Equialt Qualified Opportunity Zone Fund, LP(pty:pla), Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Equialt Secured Income Portfolio Reit, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Kathy Bazoian Phelps added to party Burton W Wiand(pty:pla))(Phelps, Kathy) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EA SIP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DLA PIPER LLP US is a litigant

Latest cases where FOX ROTHSCHILD LLP is a litigant