This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2020 at 16:29:09 (UTC).

Wi-LAN Inc. et al v. Motorola Mobility LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 Wi-LAN Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Motorola Mobility LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sharon Johnson Coleman and Gabriel A. Fuentes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00941

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sharon Johnson Coleman

Referral Judge

Gabriel A. Fuentes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wi-LAN USA, Inc.

Wi-LAN Inc.

Wi-LAN Labs, Inc.

Defendants

Motorola Mobility LLC

Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy E. Grochocinski

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton P.C.

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Barry James Bumgardner

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton P.c.

3131 W. 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Joseph Paul Oldaker

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton P.C.

15020 S. Ravinia Ave., Suite 29

Orland Park, IL 60462

Eric M. Albritton

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton P.C.

3131 W. 7Th Street, Suite 300

Forth Worth, TX 76107

John Paul Murphy

Attorney at Nelson Bumgardner Albritton P.c.

3131 W. 7Th Street, Suite 300

Fort Worth, TX 76107

Defendant Attorneys

Robert David Donoghue

Attorney at Holland & Knight LLP

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

Jacob W. S. Schneider

Attorney at Holland & Knight Llp

10 St. James Avenue

Boston, MA 02116

Anthony James Fuga

Attorney at Holland & Knight Llp

150 N. Riverside Plaza, Suite 2700

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#47

#46

#45

44 #1

Exhibit 1

#44

#43

#42

#41

#26

1 #8

Exhibit H - '743 Infringement Chart

1 #7

Exhibit G - '320 Infringement Chart

1 #6

Exhibit F - '351 Infringement Chart

1 #5

Exhibit E - '924 Infringement Chart

1 #4

Exhibit D - '743 Patent

1 #3

Exhibit C - '320 Patent

1 #2

Exhibit B - '351 Patent

1 #1

Exhibit A - '924 Patent

#1

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 2/4/2020. Claims Construction hearing is set for 9/28/2020 at 10:30 AM. The Court will reserve 9/29/2020 for the hearing. Status hearing is set for 8/7/2020 at 9:00 AM. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 3/10/20 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ber, ) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: The parties' joint motion for entry of a supplemental protective order for non-party Qualcomm, Inc. (doc. #44 ) is granted. The Court notes that the supplemental order itself does not authorize the filing of any document under seal. The under-seal filing of any discovery material with the Court must comply with Local Rule 26.2 and the law of the Circuit. See Bond v. Utreras, 585 F.3d 1061, 1073 (7th Cir. 2009) (noting that public "has a presumptive right to access discovery materials that are filed with the court"); Baxter Int'l, Inc. v. Abbott Labs., 297 F.3d 544, 545-46 (7th Cir. 2002) (stating that filed discovery documents "that influence or underpin the judicial decision are open to public inspection unless they meet the definition of trade secrets or other categories of bonafide long-term confidentiality.... In civil litigation only trade secrets, information covered by a recognized privilege (such as the attorney-client privilege), and information required by statute to be maintained in confidence (such as the name of a minor victim of sexual assault) is entitled to be kept secret"); Union Oil Co. of Cal. v. Leavell, 220 F.3d 562, 567-68 (7th Cir. 2000) ("Many a litigant would prefer that the subject matter of a case... be kept from the curious (including its business rivals and customers), but the tradition that litigation is open to the public is of very long standing."); Citizens First Nat. Bank of Princeton v. Cincinnati Ins. Co., 178 F.3d 943, 945 (7th Cir. 1999) (warning courts not to allow parties "to seal whatever they want" and urging them to apply "a neutral balancing of the relevant interests" in connection with any good-cause determination presented by a motion to seal). Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) MOTION by Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. for protective order Joint Motion Seeking Entry of Supplemental Protective Order for Non-Party Qualcomm, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing set for 3/10/20 is stricken and reset to 2/04/20 at 9:30 a.m. (or after the completion of the status hearing before Judge Coleman). Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Status hearing held on 12/6/2019. The previously entered deadlines proposed in the parties' 26(f) Report #26 are extended 60 days for all upcoming deadlines. Status hearing is set for 2/4/2020 at 9:00 AM. At that time, the Court will set a date for the Claim Construction Hearing. The following are the updated deadlines in this case: Final Infringement, Unenforceability, and Invalidity Contentions (LPR 3.1) : April 7, 2020; Final Non Infringement, Enforceability, and Validity Contentions (LPR 3.2): May 5, 2020, Document Production Accompanying Final Invalidity Contentions (LPR 3.3): May 5, 2020, Exchange of Proposed Claim Terms to be Construed Along with Proposed Constructions (LPR 4.1(a)): May 19, 2020, Meet and Confer Regarding Claim Terms (LPR 4.1(b)): May 26, 2020, Opening Claim Construction Brief (LPR 4.2(a)): June 23, 2020, Joint Appendix (LPR 4.2(b)): June 23, 2020, Responsive Claim Construction Brief (LPR 4.2(c)): July 21, 2020, Reply Claim Construction Brief (LPR 4.2(d)): August 4, 2020, Joint Claim Construction Chart, and Joint Status Report (LPR 4.2(f)): August 18, 2020. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 3/10/20 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/31/19 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov.

    < Redaction Request due 9/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/23/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/20/2019. (Mccullough, Tracey) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gabriel A. Fuentes: Status hearing held. The parties report on the status of discovery. By agreement of the parties per their Rule 26(f) report (doc. #26 ), and as confirmed at the status conference, the agreed discovery schedule as set forth on pages 3 and 4 of the Rule 26(f) report is entered. The matter is set for a status hearing before the magistrate judge on 10/15/19 at 9:30 a.m. Mailed notice. (jj, ) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by Eric M. Albritton (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: This case has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Sharon Johnson Coleman. Plaintiff is directed to advise the defendants of the status hearing forthwith. Status hearing set for 4/15/2019 at 9:00 AM. The parties are directed to meet and discuss the status of the case. The parties are to file a joint status report in the format described on the court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov at least 3 business days prior to the status. The parties are directed to discuss settlement, and whether they consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. The Court encourages the parties to review this court's website for its standing orders prior to contacting chambers. Mailed notice. (ym, ) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MAILED patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (Attachments: #1 Patent Registration)(kp, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Motorola Mobility Holdings, LLC, Motorola Mobility LLC (jjr, ) (Entered: 02/15/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Claims Involving Patents and Trademarks by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc. by Timothy E. Grochocinski (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sheila M. Finnegan. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ec, ) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement filed by Wi-LAN Inc., Wi-LAN Labs, Inc., Wi-LAN USA, Inc.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-15487267. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - '924 Patent, #2 Exhibit B - '351 Patent, #3 Exhibit C - '320 Patent, #4 Exhibit D - '743 Patent, #5 Exhibit E - '924 Infringement Chart, #6 Exhibit F - '351 Infringement Chart, #7 Exhibit G - '320 Infringement Chart, #8 Exhibit H - '743 Infringement Chart)(Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WI-LAN LABS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WI-LAN USA, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where WI-LAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where MOTOROLA MOBILITY, LLC is a litigant