Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/07/2020 at 08:27:31 (UTC).

Whorley et al v. Northam et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2020 Whorley filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Northam. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Henry E. Hudson and David J. Novak. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00255

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Henry E. Hudson

Referral Judge

David J. Novak

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy Brummett

Felipe Franco

Dwight Horton

Milton Williams, Sr.

Antonio Perryel

Brenda Van Emmenis

Courtney Stroble

Benjamen Fyfe

Candace Blakenship

Bruce Harris, Jr.

Johnathan McMillian

Warren Brooks

Ennis Stewart

Warren Medley-Green

Defendants

Tori Raiford

Brian J. Moran

Eric Aldridge

Tracy Ray

Harold Clarke

Dana Ratliffe-Walker

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elliott Michael Harding

Attorney at Harding Counsel PLLC

608 Elizabeth Ave

Charlottesville, VA 22901

Jennifer Marie Safstrom

Attorney at ACLU of Virginia

701 E. Franklin Street, Suite 1412

Richmond, VA 23219

Nicole Gloria Tortoriello

Attorney at American Civil Liberties Union of Virginia

701 E Franklin Street, Suite 1412

Richmond, VA 23219

Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar

Attorney at ACLU of Virginia

701 E. Franklin Street, Suite 1412

Richmond, VA 23219

Eden Brooke Heilman

Attorney at ACLU of Virginia

701 E. Franklin Street, Suite 1412

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorney

Margaret Hoehl O'Shea

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General (Richmond)

202 North 9Th Street

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

#15

(#15) STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

14 #1

Receipt

#14

(#14) Letter from Conrad Burke requesting documents. Copy of the complaint mailed as requested. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (smej, ) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

#13

(#13) STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Retain Jurisdiction (the "Joint Motion"), filed on May 11, 2020 #11 . For good cause shown, and in consideration of the Parties' Joint Motion, the Court hereby GRANTS the Parties' Joint Motion and conditionally dismisses the above-titled action with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). In accordance with the Settlement Agreement, which was filed with this Court as Exhibit A to Parties' Joint Motion (ECF No. #11 -1) and is attached hereto, the Court specifically retains jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms, pursuant to Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Insurance Co. of America, 511 U.S. 375 (1994). It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jsau, ) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit A

#11

(#11) Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Retain Jurisdiction by Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Safstrom on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Safstrom, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Gloria Tortoriello on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Tortoriello, Nicole) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eden Brooke Heilman on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Heilman, Eden) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

#5

(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER - Accordingly, the Court SUSPENDS the deadlines in this case for fourteen (14) days in order for the parties to have an opportunity to come to a resolution. If counsel later feel that they are making substantial progress, the Court will continue the suspension of the deadlines. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/13/2020. (smej, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#4

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hoehl O'Shea on behalf of Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr. (Harding, Elliott) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter from Conrad Burke requesting documents. Copy of the complaint mailed as requested. (Attachments: #1 Receipt) (smej, ) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STATUS REPORT by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' Joint Motion to Dismiss and Retain Jurisdiction (the "Joint Motion"), filed on May 11, 2020 #11 . For good cause shown, and in consideration of the Parties' Joint Motion, the Court hereby GRANTS the Parties' Joint Motion and conditionally dismisses the above-titled action with prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2). In accordance with the Settlement Agreement, which was filed with this Court as Exhibit A to Parties' Joint Motion (ECF No. #11 -1) and is attached hereto, the Court specifically retains jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the Settlement Agreement in accordance with its terms, pursuant to Kokkonen v. Guardian Life Insurance Co. of America, 511 U.S. 375 (1994). It is SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 5/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jsau, ) (Entered: 05/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Retain Jurisdiction by Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Heilman, Eden) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Settlement Conference held on 5/8/2020. (cgar) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Telephone Conference held on 5/1/2020. (cgar) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge David J. Novak:Settlement Conference (TELEPHONIC) held on 4/28/2020. (cgar) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2020
  • DocketSettlement Conference (TELEPHONIC) set for 4/28/2020 at 10:00 AM before District Judge David J. Novak. (cgar) (Entered: 04/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Marie Safstrom on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Safstrom, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Gloria Tortoriello on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Tortoriello, Nicole) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Eden Brooke Heilman on behalf of Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr (Heilman, Eden) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM ORDER - Accordingly, the Court SUSPENDS the deadlines in this case for fourteen (14) days in order for the parties to have an opportunity to come to a resolution. If counsel later feel that they are making substantial progress, the Court will continue the suspension of the deadlines. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Hudson on 4/13/2020. (smej, ) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • DocketTelephone Conference held on 4/13/2020 before District Judge Henry E. Hudson (rpiz) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgement filed by Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce. (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Margaret Hoehl O'Shea on behalf of Eric Aldridge, Joseph Bateman, Harold Clarke, Tikki Hicks, Thomas Meyer, Brian J. Moran, Ralph S. Northam, Tori Raiford, Dana Ratliffe-Walker, Tracy Ray, Phillip White, Rick White, Tammy Williams, Donald Wilmouth, Rodney Younce (O'Shea, Margaret) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Lartaija Banks, Candace Blakenship, Warren Brooks, Timothy Brummett, Jesse Davenport, Frank Fairchild, Felipe Franco, Benjamen Fyfe, Bruce Harris, Jr, Dwight Horton, Olivia Ivashin, Gale Jones, Johnathan McMillian, Warren Medley-Green, Matthew Mosher, Donnie Offenbacker, Antonio Perryel, Ennis Stewart, Courtney Stroble, Michael Sullivan, Larog Trowell, Brenda Van Emmenis, Anthony Vicks, Da'Von Walker, Brooke Whorley, Alonzo Williams, Milton Williams, Sr. (Harding, Elliott) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry E. Hudson. (smej, ) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint (Filing Fee: $400.00, Receipt Number: 0422-7151697) filed by Brooke Whorley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Harding, Elliott) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margaret Hoehl O'Shea