This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/03/2020 at 08:10:26 (UTC).

WHITTINGTON v. CITY OF BANGOR HALL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 WHITTINGTON filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF BANGOR HALL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are NANCY TORRESEN and JOHN C. NIVISON. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00553

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NANCY TORRESEN

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD WHITTINGTON

Bangor, ME 04401

Defendant

CITY OF BANGOR HALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

FREDERICK F. COSTLOW

Attorney at RICHARDSON, WHITMAN, LARGE & BADGER

P.O. Box 2429, One Merchants Plaza, Suite 603

Bangor, ME 04401-2429

 

Court Documents

#16

#13

#5

#17

#15

#12

#11

#9

8 #1

Medical record

#8

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

#3

#2

1 #2

Exhibits

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) AMENDED JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - By Melody Dalphonse, Deputy Clerk (mnd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) AMENDED ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JUDGMENT OF DISMISSAL - By Melody Dalphonse, Deputy Clerk (mnd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER mooting #6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER AFFIRMING THE RECOMMENDED DECISION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE - adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. By JUDGE NANCY TORRESEN. (mnd) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Response to Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by CITY OF BANGOR HALL. (COSTLOW, FREDERICK) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) LETTER to plaintiff re: pro se handout. (jwr) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE re #8 Attachment 1: Medical Records to Objection to Report and Recommended Decision filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1. Please also refer to the Information Handout for Pro Se Filers. This will be the only Notice of Violation of Fed.R.Civ.P. 5.2 or Fed.R.Crim.P. 49.1 you will receive in this case. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document adding REDACTED to the top of the filing along with, a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jwr) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Mail Service Returned on 11/5/2019 as to CITY OF BANGOR HALL. (jwr) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Objection to Report and Recommended Decision re #5 Report and Recommended Decision filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Medical record)(jwr) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MAIL (Recommended Decision) sent to Richard Whittington returned as undeliverable. Reason: Return for Postage. Remailed this date. (jwr) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction All Claims of Plaintiff Pursuant to F.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(1, 4, 5, & 6) by CITY OF BANGOR HALL Responses due by 1/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant City of Bangor's Motion to Dismiss)(COSTLOW, FREDERICK) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDED DECISION re #1 Complaint filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by RICHARD WHITTINGTON (jwr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jwr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CITY OF BANGOR HALL filed by RICHARD WHITTINGTON. (Service of Process Deadline 3/4/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Pro Se Appearance/Notice of Claim, #2 Exhibits)(jwr) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREDERICK F. COSTLOW