This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:23:54 (UTC).

Whitson v. Unknown

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Whitson filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Unknown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christopher C. Bly and Steven D. Grimberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-05509

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christopher C. Bly

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Whitson

Marietta, GA 30061

Defendant

Unknown

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) FILED IN ERROR STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj) Modified on 1/7/2020 (smj). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by James Whitson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis stamped with the case number for this action. Plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the fees noted above/ or complete and submit the application to proceed in forma pauperis/ within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the required fees or application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or at the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 1/7/2019. Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization. (jed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Complaint and #4 Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly for IFP and frivolity review. (jed) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Affidavit and Authorization for withdrawal from Inmate Account by James Whitson. (jed) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotification of Docket Correction re #2 Standing Order, Standing Order signed by Judge Grimberg entered in error. This case is currently before the magistrate judge.. (smj) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Whitson re #3 Order and Forms Sent. (jed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER: The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Plaintiff an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis stamped with the case number for this action. Plaintiff is ORDERED to either pay the fees noted above/ or complete and submit the application to proceed in forma pauperis/ within 30 days of the date this Order is entered. The Clerk is DIRECTED to resubmit this action to the undersigned upon receipt of the required fees or application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis or at the expiration of the aforementioned time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly on 1/7/2019. Forms sent to party: Affidavit and Authorization. (jed) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to James Whitson re #2 Standing Order regarding civil litigation. (smj) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILED IN ERROR STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. All counsel of record and pro se parties are required to sign and file, within 10 days after entry of this Order, a Certificate of Compliance in a format consistent with the Certificate of Compliance attached as Exhibit B. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 10/02/19. (smj) Modified on 1/7/2020 (smj). (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • Docket---ENTRY MADE IN ERROR: Incorrect Case ---USM forms and proposed summons received by clerk. (aaq) Modified on 12/13/2019 to edit text. (aaq). (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Complaint to Magistrate Judge Christopher C. Bly for IFP review. (ah) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by James Whitson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.