This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 08:43:17 (UTC).

Whitmore v. Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Whitmore filed an Other lawsuit against Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01445

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christal Whitmore

Defendant

Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Bradford W Botes

Attorney at Bond, Botes, Reese & Shinn, P.C.

15 Southlake Lanesuite 140

Birmingham, AL 35244

David J. Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Roadsuite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

Mary Elizabeth Philipps

Attorney at Philipps & Philipps, Ltd.

9760 S. Roberts Roadsuite One

Palos Hills, IL 60465

Defendant Attorney

Neal D Moore, III

Attorney at MOORE YOUNG FOSTER & HAZELTON LLC

1122 Edenton Street

Birmingham, AL 35242

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd, filed by Christal Whitmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

#2

(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Christal Whitmore. (KEK) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christal Whitmore. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Local Counsel)(KEK) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

3 #1

Consent of Local Counsel

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Botes, Bradford) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christal Whitmore. Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. filed by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christal Whitmore (Philipps, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#12

(#12) ORDER OF DISMISSAL The court acknowledges receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal (doc. #11 ) filed on December 7, 2021. So, under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/15/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER OF DISMISSAL The court acknowledges receipt of the plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal (doc. #11 ) filed on December 7, 2021. So, under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), this case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/15/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christal Whitmore (Philipps, David) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER GRANTING #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Shall Respond to Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by December 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 12/1/2021. (SRD) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. filed by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. (Moore, Neal) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christal Whitmore. Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd served on 11/8/2021, answer due 11/29/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 11/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 10/29/2021. (KEK) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Bradford W Botes on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Botes, Bradford) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3952396 (ALND B4601116624). (Philipps, David) Modified on 10/29/2021 (KEK). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3952395 (ALND B4601116625). (Philipps, David) Modified on 10/29/2021 (KEK). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3952388 (ALNd B4601116623) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd, filed by Christal Whitmore. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(KEK). (Philipps, David) Modified on 10/29/2021 (KEK). (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Christal Whitmore. (Attachments: #1 Consent of Local Counsel)(KEK) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for service by certified mail filed by Christal Whitmore. (KEK) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nationwide Recovery Systems Ltd, filed by Christal Whitmore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(KEK) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationwide Recovery Systems, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neal DeWitt Moore, III