This case was last updated from PACER on 01/24/2021 at 07:09:02 (UTC).

Whitmore v. Global Payments, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Whitmore filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Global Payments, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roger T. Benitez and Daniel E. Butcher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-02305

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roger T. Benitez

Referral Judge

Daniel E. Butcher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jamica Whitmore

Defendants

Global Payment Holding Company

Heartland Payment Systems, LLC

Darcy Seirer

Global Payments, Inc.

DOES 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Margie Rene Potter

Attorney at Potter Handy, LLP

8033 Linda Vista Rd, Suite 200

San Diego, CA 92111

Defendant Attorney

Kaitlin H. Owen

Attorney at Alston & Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street, Suite 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Darcy Seirer without prejudice by Jamica Whitmore. (Potter, Margie) (mme). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/4/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 12/15/2020.(mme)(jrd) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Global Payment Holding Company, Global Payments, Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Darcy Seirer re #1 Notice of Removal,, to Federal Court (Owen, Kaitlin) (mme). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Global Payment Holding Company, Global Payments, Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Darcy Seirer. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

1 #5

Declaration -3

1 #4

Declaration -2

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit State Court Complaint Included

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00036911-CU-WT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14937471.), filed by Global Payments, Inc., Global Payment Holding Company, Darcy Seirer, Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint Included, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration -2, #5 Declaration -3)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2305-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Darcy Seirer without prejudice by Jamica Whitmore. (Potter, Margie) (mme). (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 2/4/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Joint Discovery Plan due 1/28/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 12/15/2020.(mme)(jrd) (Entered: 12/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE Of Filing Of State Court Answers by Global Payment Holding Company, Global Payments, Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Darcy Seirer re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Defendants Global Payments Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Global Payment Holding Company, and Darcy Sierers Notice Of Filing Of State Court Answers, #2 Exhibit B to Defendants Global Payments Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Global Payment Holding Company, and Darcy Sierers Notice Of Filing Of State Court Answers)(Owen, Kaitlin) (mme). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Global Payment Holding Company, Global Payments, Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Darcy Seirer re #1 Notice of Removal,, to Federal Court (Owen, Kaitlin) (mme). (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Global Payment Holding Company, Global Payments, Inc., Heartland Payment Systems, LLC, Darcy Seirer. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00036911-CU-WT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14937471.), filed by Global Payments, Inc., Global Payment Holding Company, Darcy Seirer, Heartland Payment Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint Included, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration -2, #5 Declaration -3)The new case number is 3:20-cv-2305-BEN-DEB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt). (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heartland Payment Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Payments Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Margie Rene Potter