This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/06/2022 at 08:32:05 (UTC).

Whitman v. DCP Midstream, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/07/2022 Whitman filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against DCP Midstream, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F Heil, III and Christine D Little. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00106

  • Filing Date:

    03/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F Heil, III

Referral Judge

Christine D Little

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joel Whitman

Defendant

DCP Midstream, LLC

Intervenor Defendant

Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Wells Dunlap

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

William Richard Liles

Attorney at Schmoyer Reinhard LLP

8000 Ih 10 West, Suite 1600

San Antonio, TX 77046

Michael A Josephson

Attorney at Josephson Dunlap

11 Greenway Plaza, Ste 3050

Houston, TX 77046

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway Ave Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-6210

Defendant Attorneys

Jason N.W. Plowman

Attorney at Polsinelli PC-Kansas City-48th Place

900 West 48Th Place, Suite 900

Kansas City, MO 64112-1895

Matthew E. Kapsak

Attorney at Polsinelli PC-Denver

1401 Lawrence Street, Suite 2300

Denver, CO 80202

Donald L. Samuels

Attorney at Polsinelli PC

1401 Lawrence Street, Ste 2300

Denver, CO 80108

Denelda Richardson

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable PLLC

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

John H Tucker

Attorney at Rhodes Hieronymus Jones Tucker & Gable PLLC

Po Box 21100

Tulsa, OK 74121-1100

Intervenor Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach

Attorney at Workplace Counsel

1401 Lawrence Street, Suite 1600

Denver, CO 80202

John Barrick Bollman

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery LLP

444 W. Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60610

Paul DeMuro

Attorney at Frederic Dorwart Lawyers

124 E 4Th St

Tulsa, OK 74103-5010

Rachel Beth Cowen

Attorney at McDermott Will & Emery

444 West Lake Street, Suite 4000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

28 #10

Exhibit A9 to Moyer Declaration - Paystubs

28 #7

Exhibit A6 to Moyer Declaration - Acknowledgement of Drug and Alcohol Misuse Pre

28 #4

Exhibit A3 to Moyer Declaration - Consent to Electronic Distribution of Employee

28 #3

Exhibit A2 to Moyer Declaration - Acknowledgment of Employee Handbook

28 #2

Exhibit A1 to Moyer Declaration - Employment Agreement

28 #1

Affidavit of Sharon Moyer

21 #13

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

21 #12

Exhibit A10 to Moyer Declaration

21 #8

Exhibit A6 to Moyer Declaration

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Whitman. DCP Midstream, LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/12/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Joel WhitmanAttorney William R. Liles added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla) (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Joel WhitmanAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to DCP Midstream, LLC by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Consent

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jason N.W. Plowman added to party DCP Midstream, LLC(pty:dft) by DCP Midstream, LLC.(Plowman, Jason) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 12/28/2020)

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III regarding delay of Scheduling Order. (Re: #28 , #21 ) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 04/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) Joint STATUS REPORT by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC (Bollman, John) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 4/27/2022) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Donald L. Samuels on behalf of DCP Midstream, LLC (Samuels, Donald) (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of Joel Whitman [Note: Attorney Michael Burrage added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla).] (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Rachel Beth Cowen on behalf of Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC [Note: Attorney Rachel Beth Cowen added to party Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC(pty:intvd).] (Cowen, Rachel) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent Cypress Energy Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Energy Holdings II, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Energy GP Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Environmental Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Cypress Environmental Partners, G.P., LLC for Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC) by Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC (DeMuro, Paul) (Entered: 03/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • Docket(#72) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Plaintiff is directed to comply with Local General Rule 4-3(a) regarding the responsibilities of non-resident counsel, or to show cause why he has not, no later than April 8, 2022. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge John F Heil, III Granting Defendant's motion as to Donald L. Samuels. Local counsel is directed to advise him of the requirements of Local General Rule 4-4(a) and the need to register as a CM/ECF user in this Court ; granting #70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (JFH1, Chambers) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) MOTION for Attorney(s) Donald L. Samuels to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $50 PHV fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2585368) by DCP Midstream, LLC (With attachments) (Tucker, John) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jason N.W. Plowman added to party DCP Midstream, LLC(pty:dft) by DCP Midstream, LLC.(Plowman, Jason) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant DCP Midstream, LLC. DCP Midstream, LLC answer due 12/28/2020. (Samuels, Donald) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joel Whitman. DCP Midstream, LLC served on 11/16/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (rvill, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Liles on behalf of Joel WhitmanAttorney William R. Liles added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla) (Liles, William) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Joel WhitmanAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to DCP Midstream, LLC by Plaintiff Joel Whitman. (Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DCP Midstream, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7583346)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party Joel Whitman(pty:pla), filed by Joel Whitman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Josephson, Michael) [Transferred from Colorado on 3/8/2022.] (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DCP Midstream Marketing LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Barrick Bollman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Lyn Gokenbach