This case was last updated from PACER on 08/17/2021 at 08:03:13 (UTC).

WHITFIELD v. PROOFPOINT, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 WHITFIELD filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against PROOFPOINT, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02733

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MITCHELL S. GOLDBERG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW WHITFIELD

Defendants

JONATHAN FEIBER

DANA EVAN

KEVIN HARVEY

PROOFPOINT, INC.

ELIZABETH RAFAEL

RICHARD WALLACE

KRISTEN GIL

MICHAEL JOHNSON

GARY STEELE

LEYLA SEKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA H. GRABAR

Attorney at GRABAR LAW OFFICE

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To ALL DEFENDANTS(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

#2

(#2) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15199157.), filed by MATTHEW WHITFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs As To ALL DEFENDANTS(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 12(b) PROCEDURAL ORDER (sl, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to DANA EVAN, JONATHAN FEIBER, KRISTEN GIL, KEVIN HARVEY, MICHAEL JOHNSON, PROOFPOINT, INC., ELIZABETH RAFAEL, LEYLA SEKA, GARY STEELE, RICHARD WALLACE. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 6/23/21 (bw, ) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-15199157.), filed by MATTHEW WHITFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROOFPOINT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua H Grabar