This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/19/2021 at 07:09:38 (UTC).

WHITFIELD v. KADMON HOLDINGS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 WHITFIELD filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against KADMON HOLDINGS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. KEARNEY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04605

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MARK A. KEARNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MATTHEW WHITFIELD

Defendants

KADMON HOLDINGS, INC.

TASOS G KONIDARIS

HARLAN W WAKSAL

EUGENE BAUER

DAVID E. COHEN

ARTHUR KIRSCH

NANCY MILLER-RICH

CYNTHIA SCHWALM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSHUA H. GRABAR

Attorney at GRABAR LAW OFFICE

One Liberty Place, 1650 Market St Suite 3600

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

#2

(#2) ORDER THAT MR. WHITFIELD SHALL, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 29, 2021, EITHER AMEND HIS COMPLAINT TO DEMONSTRATE OUR VENUE OR SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS OR TRANSFER THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD THE PROPER VENUE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/22/21. 10/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW WHITFIELD As To ALL DEFENDANTS(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE UNDER F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/29/21. 10/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE UNDER F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i); & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/29/21. 10/29/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(kw, ) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MATTHEW WHITFIELD As To ALL DEFENDANTS(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT MR. WHITFIELD SHALL, ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 29, 2021, EITHER AMEND HIS COMPLAINT TO DEMONSTRATE OUR VENUE OR SHOW CAUSE IN A MEMORANDUM NOT EXCEEDING SEVEN PAGES AS TO WHY THIS COURT SHOULD NOT DISMISS OR TRANSFER THE COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD THE PROPER VENUE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 10/22/21. 10/22/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by MATTHEW WHITFIELD. (JL ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to EUGENE BAUER, DAVID E. COHEN, KADMON HOLDINGS, INC., ARTHUR KIRSCH, TASOS G KONIDARIS, NANCY MILLER-RICH, CYNTHIA SCHWALM, HARLAN W WAKSAL. E-Mailed To: counsel on 10/22/21. (kw, ) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15490187.), filed by MATTHEW WHITFIELD. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(GRABAR, JOSHUA) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua H Grabar