This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:51:08 (UTC).

Whiteside v. SPSG Partners et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Whiteside filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against SPSG Partners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Troy L. Nunley and Dennis M. Cota. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01643

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Troy L. Nunley

Referral Judge

Dennis M. Cota

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephon Whiteside

Defendants

Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC

SPSG Partners

Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc.

SPSG Partners, LLC

Sukut Construction, Inc.

Sukut Construction, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Galen T. Shimoda

Attorney at Shimoda Law Corp.

9401 E. Stockton Blvd., Suite 120

Elk Grove, CA 95624

Renald Konini

Attorney at Shimoda Law Corp.

9401 E. Stockton Blvd., Suite 120

Elk Grove, CA 95624

Jessica Lynne Hart

Attorney at Shimoda Law Corp.

9401 E. Stockton Blvd., Suite 120

Elk Grove, CA 95624

Defendant Attorneys

Mia Angelina Lomedico

Attorney at Atkinson, Adelson, Loya, Ruud & Romo

12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

Scott K. Dauscher

Attorney at Atkinson Andelson Loya Ruud & Romo

12800 Center Court Drive, Suite 300

Cerritos, CA 90703

 

Court Documents

#10

9 #2

Request for Judicial Notice

9 #1

Declaration of Mia A. Lomedico

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #3

Exhibits

5 #2

Declaration

5 #1

Memorandum

#5

4 #1

Exhibt A

#4

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

2 #2

VDRP

2 #1

Consent Form

#2

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/8/2020: On the Court's own motion, Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and for Attorney Fees (ECF No. #5 ) is hereby SUBMITTED without oral argument. Accordingly, the hearing set for 10/15/2020 is VACATED. If the Court determines oral argument is necessary, it will be scheduled at a later date. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY by Stephon Whiteside re #9 Opposition to Motion,. (Shimoda, Galen) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) OPPOSITION by Goodfellow Bros. CA, LLC, Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc., SPSG Partners, SPSG Partners, LLC, Sukut Construction, Inc., Sukut Construction, LLC. to #5 Motion to Remand, Motion for Attorney Fees. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mia A. Lomedico, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Dauscher, Scott) Modified on 10/5/2020 (Reader, L). (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Scott K. Dauscher on behalf of Goodfellow Bros. California, LLC, Pacific States Environmental Contractors, Inc., SPSG Partners, SPSG Partners, LLC, Sukut Construction, Inc., Sukut Construction, LLC.. Attorney Dauscher, Scott K. added. (Dauscher, Scott) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: Added attorney Renald Konini,Jessica Lynne Hart for Stephon Whiteside. (Hart, Jessica) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PROPOSED ORDER re #5 Motion to Remand and Motion for Attorney Fees. (Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 9/14/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to REMAND and MOTION for ATTORNEY FEES by Stephon Whiteside. Motion Hearing set for 10/15/2020 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Attachments: #1Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibits) (Shimoda, Galen) Modified on 9/14/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of #2 Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order by SPSG Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibt A)(Lomedico, Mia) Modified on 8/24/2020 (Huang, H). (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE of Notice to Adverse Party by SPSG Partners. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lomedico, Mia) Modified on 8/19/2020 (York, M). (Entered: 08/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Butte County Superior Court, case number 20CV00090 by SPSG Partners. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9056058) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Declaration of Michael Crawford, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Certificate of Service)(Lomedico, Mia) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SPSG Partners is a litigant