This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/28/2021 at 07:54:28 (UTC).

Whitesell v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 10/29/2021 Whitesell filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alex G. Tse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08464

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan Whitesell

Defendant

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert John McKennon

Attorney at McKennon Schindler LLP

20321 Sw Birch Streetsuite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Joseph Stephen McMillen

Attorney at McKennon Law Group PC

20321 Sw Birch St., Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorney

Jenny Haeok Wang

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

Park Tower, Fifteenth Floor695 Town Center Drive

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16572907.). Filed byRyan Whitesell. (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Ryan Whitesell . (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Whitesell re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

#8

(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Whitesell.. (McMillen, Joseph) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Whitesell. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to January 13, 2022 filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Wang, Jenny) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint to January 13, 2022 filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Wang, Jenny) (Filed on 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ryan Whitesell. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 12/3/2021, answer due 12/27/2021. (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 12/13/2021) (Entered: 12/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ryan Whitesell.. (McMillen, Joseph) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/28/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2022 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/15/2021. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2021) (Entered: 11/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Ryan Whitesell re #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet by Ryan Whitesell . (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16572907.). Filed byRyan Whitesell. (McKennon, Robert) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jenny H. Wang