This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/01/2022 at 08:07:39 (UTC).

Whitehurst v. Clark et al

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Whitehurst filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James C. Dever, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CT-03047

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James C. Dever, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst

Windsor, NC 27983

Defendants

Demetrius A. Clark

Anthony A. Adams

Timothy Lewis

NC Department of Public Safety

Bertie Correctional Institution

Officer Saddler

Mr. Snyder

Sgt. Roller

Charlotte Evans

 

Court Documents

14 #2

Envelope

14 #1

Documents in Support

#14

(#14) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#13

(#13) Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service of a Summons sent to NC Department of Public Safety on 3/29/2022 via email regarding Timothy Lewis and Officer Saddler. Response due by 5/27/2022. (Castania, M) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff may proceed with his claim alleging deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against defendants Saddler and Lewis. The court DISMISSES all other claims and defendants, along with plaintiff's request for release from incarceration. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/29/2022. Copy served via US Mail: Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst 1250819, Bertie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 129, Windsor, NC 27983. (Castania, M) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

11 #1

Envelope

#11

(#11) Letter from Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst requesting copies of subpoenas. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

10 #1

Envelope

#10

(#10) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#9

(#9) Proposed Order (Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

8 #3

Envelope

8 #2

Cover Letter

8 #1

Documents in Support

#8

(#8) TRUTH AFFIDAVIT Power of Attorney in Fact filed by Anthony A. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/24/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #14 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (Lopez, R.) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Lopez, R.) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Notice of Lawsuit and REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service of a Summons sent to NC Department of Public Safety on 3/29/2022 via email regarding Timothy Lewis and Officer Saddler. Response due by 5/27/2022. (Castania, M) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER denying #10 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff may proceed with his claim alleging deliberate indifference to a serious medical need against defendants Saddler and Lewis. The court DISMISSES all other claims and defendants, along with plaintiff's request for release from incarceration. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 3/29/2022. Copy served via US Mail: Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst 1250819, Bertie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 129, Windsor, NC 27983. (Castania, M) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever, III regarding #10 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel. (Poole, A) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Letter from Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst requesting copies of subpoenas. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Poole, A) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Proposed Order (Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction and a Temporary Restraining Order) filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TRUTH AFFIDAVIT Power of Attorney in Fact filed by Anthony A. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III for initial review. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER - GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/24/2022. Copy sent to plaintiff via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. regarding #2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRUST FUND INFORMATION REQUESTED. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order (Prisoner Litigation Reform Act). Response to Order due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 2/1/2022. Copy sent via US Mail. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Plaintiff at Bertie Correctional. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Indig, A.) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Anthony A. Adams, Bertie Correctional Institution, Demetrius A. Clark, Charlotte Evans, Timothy Lewis, NC Department of Public Safety, Sgt. Roller, Officer Saddler and Mr. Snyder filed by Angelo Ronnell Whitehurst. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Cover Letter, #3 Envelope) (Indig, A.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/25/2022: #4 Proposed Summons) (Indig, A.). (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where N.C. Dept. of Public Safety is a litigant