This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/04/2022 at 09:31:14 (UTC).

Whitehead v. Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Whitehead filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric R. Komitee and Vera M. Scanlon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06764

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eric R. Komitee

Referral Judge

Vera M. Scanlon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joann Whitehead

Defendants

Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Douglas M. Fambrough, III

J. Kevin Buchi

Stephen Doberstein

Martin Freed

Patrick Gray

Stephen J. Hoffman

Adam M. Koppel

Marc Kozin

Cynthia Smith

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel Sadeh

Attorney at Halper Sadeh LLP

667 Madison Avenueste 5Th Floor

New York, NY 10065

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#5

(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/13/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 3/29/2022. In addition to appearing parties' submission of the CMP as directed herein, in the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/24/2022. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joann Whitehead (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (Guy, Alicia) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joann Whitehead (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephonic Initial Conference is scheduled for 4/13/2022 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. The parties are to call 877-336-1829 and type in the access code 3581283 for the AT&T conference bridge. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. The parties must complete the attached Joint Proposed Case Management Plan (CMP) and file it on ECF no later than 3/29/2022. In addition to appearing parties' submission of the CMP as directed herein, in the event that any Defendant(s) has not answered or otherwise appeared, Plaintiff(s) must also mail a copy of this Order, its attachment and the full docket to the last known mailing address(es) for such Defendant(s) and file proof on ECF by the CMP filing date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 1/24/2022. (Quinlan, Krista) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Eric R. Komitee and Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against J. Kevin Buchi, Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Stephen Doberstein, Douglas M. Fambrough, III, Martin Freed, Patrick Gray, Stephen J. Hoffman, Adam M. Koppel, Marc Kozin, Cynthia Smith filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15090745 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joann Whitehead. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sadeh, Daniel) (Entered: 12/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dicerna Pharmaceuticals, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Sadeh