This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/16/2021 at 09:29:07 (UTC).

WHITE v. WALMART INC.

Case Summary

On 02/15/2021 WHITE filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against WALMART INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael A. Shipp and Douglas E. Arpert. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-02572

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael A. Shipp

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NICHOLAS WHITE

Defendants

JOHN DOES 1-10

WALMART INC.

ABC CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONATHAN S. FABRICANT

Attorney at BATHGATE, WEGENER & WOLF, PC

One Airport Road

Lakewood, NJ 08701

Defendant Attorneys

DAVID S. KIM

Attorney at FORD & HARRISON LLP

300 Connell Drive, Suite 4100

Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922

KEYA CHAIM DENNER

Attorney at FordHarrison LLP

300 Connell Drive, Suite 4100

Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922

ANAIS VALENTINA PACCIONE

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP

200 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WALMART INC..(DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

#10

(#10) LETTER ORDER that the initial conference set for 3/30/2021 at 10:30 AM. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144); Joint Discovery Plan is due 7 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/4/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

#9

(#9) Letter from Keya C. Denner. (DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANAIS VALENTINA PACCIONE on behalf of WALMART INC. (PACCIONE, ANAIS) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEYA CHAIM DENNER on behalf of WALMART INC. (DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#6

(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time by which Defendant shall answer through and including 3/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/2/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION Extending Time to File Answer by WALMART INC.. (DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

#4

(#4) Ordered Initial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will be held via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/17/2021. (eh, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#3

(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (KIM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC.. (KIM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

1 #4

Certificate of Service

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-000114-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12127279), filed by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(KIM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2021
  • Docket(#12) TEXT ORDER: The Initial Conference via telephone has been re-set for 5/4/2021 10:00 AM. Counsel for plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers 609-989-2144. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/30/2021. (eh, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketTEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 3/30/2021, via telephone. (eh, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by WALMART INC..(DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) LETTER ORDER that the initial conference set for 3/30/2021 at 10:30 AM. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144); Joint Discovery Plan is due 7 days prior to the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/4/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter from Keya C. Denner. (DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ANAIS VALENTINA PACCIONE on behalf of WALMART INC. (PACCIONE, ANAIS) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEYA CHAIM DENNER on behalf of WALMART INC. (DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time by which Defendant shall answer through and including 3/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 3/2/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION Extending Time to File Answer by WALMART INC.. (DENNER, KEYA) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Ordered Initial Conference set for 3/16/2021 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert will be held via telephone. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/17/2021. (eh, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #3 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WALMART INC. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/8/2021. (abr, ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the Complaint.. (KIM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by WALMART INC.. (KIM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketJudge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (jjc, ) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WALMART INC. from Superior Court of NJ, Ocean County, case number OCN-L-000114-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12127279), filed by WALMART INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Certificate of Service)(KIM, DAVID) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keya Chaim Denner

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David S. Kim