This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:50:15 (UTC).

White v. Todd et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 White filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Todd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ivan D. Davis and Liam O'Grady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00803

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ivan D. Davis

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn W. White

Portsmouth, VA 23701

Defendants

Todd

lackey

Shildt

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Dkt. No. 4] be and is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 be and is conditionally granted to the extent that plaintiff need not prepay the filing fee at this time. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/13/2020. (dvanm, c/m 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) Letter MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shawn W. White. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, c/m 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Data Sheet

#1

(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Shildt, Todd, lackey, filed by Shawn W. White. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Dkt. No. 4] be and is DENIED. ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 be and is conditionally granted to the extent that plaintiff need not prepay the filing fee at this time. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 08/13/2020. (dvanm, c/m 8/13/2020) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shawn W. White. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Acknowledgment of Receipt. (dvanm, c/m 7/17/2020) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn W. White. (dvanm, ) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Prisoner COMPLAINT against Shildt, Todd, lackey, filed by Shawn W. White. (Attachments: #1 Data Sheet, #2 Envelope)(dvanm, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2020) (dvanm, ). (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less