This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/14/2020 at 11:05:50 (UTC).

White v. Texas Petroleum Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 White filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Texas Petroleum Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Keith P Ellison. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-02102

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Keith P Ellison

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sean White

Defendant

Texas Petroleum Group, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

R Bruce Tharpe

Attorney at Law Office of R Bruce Tharpe PLLC

Po Box 101

Olmito, TX 78575

Defendant Attorney

Maryalyce Walsh Cox

Attorney at Mehaffy Weber PC

One Allen Center, 500 Dallas St., Ste. 2800

Houston, TX 77704

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) REPLY to #8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Texas Petroleum Group, LLC. (Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Ffor Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Sean White. (Tharpe, R) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

7 #4

Proposed Order

7 #3

Exhibit 2 Continue

7 #2

Exhibit 2

7 #1

Exhibit 1

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Ffor Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Texas Petroleum Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Continue, #4 Proposed Order)(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

#6

(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Texas Petroleum Group, LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020, filed.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sean White, filed.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Texas Petroleum Group, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

#2

(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Texas Petroleum Group, LLC, filed.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Texas Petroleum Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24801623) filed by Sean White.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REPLY to #8 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Texas Petroleum Group, LLC. (Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE in Opposition to #7 MOTION to Dismiss Ffor Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction, filed by Sean White. (Tharpe, R) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Dismiss Ffor Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction by Texas Petroleum Group, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2 Continue, #4 Proposed Order)(Cox, Maryalyce) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Texas Petroleum Group, LLC served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020, filed.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Sean White, filed.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 3A Houston before Judge Keith P Ellison. (Signed by Judge Keith P Ellison) Parties notified.(ChristopherSarratadi, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Texas Petroleum Group, LLC. Issued summons delivered to plaintiff by NEF, filed.(JosephWells, 4) (Entered: 06/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Request for Issuance of Summons as to Texas Petroleum Group, LLC, filed.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Texas Petroleum Group, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-24801623) filed by Sean White.(Tharpe, R) (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEXAS PETROLEUM GROUP LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer R Bruce Tharpe