This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2022 at 09:58:09 (UTC).

White v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2021 White filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-03124

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy White

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Brian Christopher Petroff

Attorney at Bachus & Schanker LLC-Denver

101 West Colfax Avenuesuite 650

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Rebecca Kirsten Wagner

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkwaysuite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

Alan Oterin

Attorney at Campbell Wagner Frazier & Dvorchak, LLC

5251 Dtc Parkwaysuite 400

Greenwood Village, CO 80111

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Christopher Petroff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Petroff, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Oterin on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Alan Oterin added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Oterin added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Oterin, Alan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

#10

(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 24 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/25/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

#8

(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#7

(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/23/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03124-STV. (trvo, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

#6

(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#5

(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 10/29/2021, filed by Plaintiff Amy White (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

#4

(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Amy White.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

1 #12

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #10

Corporate Disclosure Statement

1 #9

Exhibit C - SEC Form

1 #8

Exhibit B - Registered Voter Information

1 #6

Docket Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #3

Exhibit A - Summons

1 #2

Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brian Christopher Petroff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Petroff, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan Oterin on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Alan Oterin added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Alan Oterin added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Oterin, Alan) (Entered: 12/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 24 November 2021. Consent Form due by 1/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/25/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2022 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/23/2021. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. All future pleadings should be designated as 21-cv-03124-STV. (trvo, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 10/29/2021, filed by Plaintiff Amy White (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Amy White.(cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, ) (Entered: 11/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Grand County District Court, Case Number 2021CV30051. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8187326), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Summons, #4 Exhibit A - Summons, #5 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service, #6 Docket Sheet, #7 Exhibit B - Grand County Assessor info, #8 Exhibit B - Registered Voter Information, #9 Exhibit C - SEC Form, #10 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Rebecca) (Entered: 11/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rebecca Kirsten Wagner