This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 10:01:13 (UTC).

WHITE v. SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 WHITE filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and LANCE E. WALKER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00001

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

LANCE E. WALKER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STEPHEN RICHARD WHITE

Defendant

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER

Interested Party

SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES E. TRAINOR

Attorney at DESMOND & RAND, P.A.

55 Stroudwater Street

Westbrook, ME 04098

Defendant Attorney

NATASHA OELTJEN

Attorney at SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION

J.F.K. Federal Building, Room 625

Boston, MA 02203

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Social Security Appeal) by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. (Attachments: #1 Court transcript index, #2 Documents related to admin process, #3 Payment documents & decisions, #4 Jurisdictional documents & notices, #5 Non disability related development, #6 Disability related development, #7 Medical records 1/16, #8 Medical records 2/16, #9 Medical records 3/16, #10 Medical records 4/16, #11 Medical records 5/16, #12 Medical records 6/16, #13 Medical records 7/16, #14 Medical records 8/16, #15 Medical records 9/16, #16 Medical records 10/16, #17 Medical records 11/16, #18 Medical records 12/16, #19 Medial records 13/16, #20 Medical records 14/16, #21 Medical records 15/16, #22 Medical records 16/16)(OELTJEN, NATASHA) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER.(OELTJEN, NATASHA) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by NATASHA OELTJEN on behalf of SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER (OELTJEN, NATASHA) (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline for SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER per Affidavit of Service filed on 2/24/2020, the United States Attorney for the District of Maine was served on 01/08/2020. Answer due by 3/9/2020. (meh) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service by STEPHEN RICHARD WHITE. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt card from Attorney General)(TRAINOR, CHARLES) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketSet Answer Deadline Regarding Affidavit of Service : Answer due by 3/3/2020. (meh) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by STEPHEN RICHARD WHITE. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit Return Receipt, #3 Exhibit USPS Tracking, #4 Exhibit Copies of Envelopes with Matching Tracking Numbers)(TRAINOR, CHARLES) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Docket Entry Modification regarding 4 Notice Re: Personal Data Identifiers: Counsel are to disregard this notice as it was entered in error. (jwr) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee Received from STEPHEN RICHARD WHITE: Amount Paid: $400. Receipt Number: 220000412. Method of Payment: check. Purpose of Payment: filing fee. Date Paid: 1/03/2020 re #1 Complaint. (bfa) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **ENTERED IN ERROR**NOTICE re #1 Complaint, filed by STEPHEN RICHARD WHITE. Although the Clerks Office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. The filing party may remedy this violation by filing a redacted version of the document and separately filing a Motion to Seal the previously filed unredacted document. If no action is taken the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (jhw) Modified on 1/3/2020 to indicate it was entered in error (jwr). (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER. Counsel shall print the embossed summons and effect service in the manner in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. Note-If you are using Version 6 of Adobe Acrobat, be sure the PRINT WHAT field is set to DOCUMENTS AND COMMENTS (Click File, then Print to check this setting). (Attachments: #1 Summons- Attorney General, #2 Summons- U.S. Attorney)(jhw) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (jhw) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SOCIAL SECURITY ADMINISTRATION COMMISSIONER PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by STEPHEN RICHARD WHITE. (Service of Process Deadline 4/1/2020) Fee due by 1/6/2020.(jhw) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.