This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:26:48 (UTC).

White v. Secretary, Department of Corrections et al (Osceola County)

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 White filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Secretary, Department of Corrections Osceola County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory J. Kelly and Carlos E. Mendoza. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-02292

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Gregory J. Kelly

Presiding Judge

Carlos E. Mendoza

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Cody L. White

Lake City, FL 32025

Respondents

Attorney General, State of Florida

Secretary, Department of Corrections

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Pamela J. Koller

Attorney at Office of the Attorney General

Suite 500, 444 Seabreeze Blvd

Daytona Beach, FL 32118

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #2 Related case order by Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections. Related case(s): yes (Koller, Pamela) Modified on 1/22/2020 (SPM). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J. Koller on behalf of Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections (Koller, Pamela) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

5 #1

Exhibit Habeas petition

#5

(#5) ORDER to respond and show cause within 90 days why the petition should not be granted. #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Habeas petition)(LAK) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

4 #1

Trust Fund Account Statement

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cody L. White. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Account Statement)(SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cody L. White. Related case(s): no (SPM) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#2

(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Cody L. White. (No fee paid and no IFP motion filed)(SPM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) re #2 Related case order by Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections. Related case(s): yes (Koller, Pamela) Modified on 1/22/2020 (SPM). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Pamela J. Koller on behalf of Attorney General, State of Florida, Secretary, Department of Corrections (Koller, Pamela) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER to respond and show cause within 90 days why the petition should not be granted. #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is granted. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Habeas petition)(LAK) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Cody L. White. (Attachments: #1 Trust Fund Account Statement)(SPM) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Gregory J. Kelly. (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Cody L. White. Related case(s): no (SPM) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 12/17/2019. (DJD) ctp (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - State filed by Cody L. White. (No fee paid and no IFP motion filed)(SPM) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.